blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2819124


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
28.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.10.2018  [2018/44]
14.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
07.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
24.08.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
27.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.05.2018  [2018/22]
23.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.04.2018  [2018/17]
15.09.2017 (Expected) grant published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
08.09.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
08.09.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
08.09.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
25.04.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
07.04.2017 Change - classification published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
07.04.2017 Change - classification published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
01.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.12.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
26.08.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.08.2016 First examination report
20.04.2016 Amendment by applicant
01.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.09.2015 Change - classification published on  21.10.2015  [2015/43]
18.09.2015 Change - classification published on  21.10.2015  [2015/43]
18.09.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  21.10.2015  [2015/43]
24.04.2015 Change - extension states published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
04.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]
28.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]
23.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.08.2014 Amendment by applicant
21.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
13.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
30.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication