blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2819124
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2016322122Global Dossier 03.11.2016A1
Priority number Date
JP2012037694 23.02.2012
WO2013JP54707 25.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20150021015Global Dossier 27.02.2015A
Priority number Date
JP2012037694 23.02.2012
WO2013JP54707 25.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2819124Global Dossier 18.10.2017B1
EP2819124 21.10.2015A4
EP2819124 31.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2012037694 23.02.2012
WO2013JP54707 25.02.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013125720Global Dossier 29.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
JP2012037694 23.02.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6395175BGlobal Dossier 26.09.2018B2
JP2013174458 05.09.2013A
Priority number Date
JP2012037694 23.02.2012