Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2819124

EP2819124 - RADIATION-SHIELDING SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.04.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toppan Printing Co., Ltd.
5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku
Tokyo 110-8560 / JP
For all designated states
Tomoegawa Co., Ltd.
1-7-1, Kyobashi Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8335 / JP
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / HAYAKAWA, Masaru
c/o Toppan Printing Co. Ltd.
5-1 Taito 1-chome
Taito-ku
Tokyo 110-8560 / JP
02 / TSUCHIDA, Minoru
c/o Tomoegawa Paper Co. Ltd.
3-1 Mochimunetomoe-cho
Suruga-ku
Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-0192 / JP
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2015/01]
Application number, filing date13752307.225.02.2013
[2017/42]
WO2013JP54707
Priority number, dateJP2012003769423.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012037694
[2015/01]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013125720
Date:29.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2819124
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2819124
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:G21F1/12, G21F3/00, G21F1/08, G21F1/10, A41D13/04, A62B17/00, D04H3/015, D04H3/10, D04H3/153, D06M11/83, D21H11/04, D21H17/67, D21H21/18, D21H21/20, // G21F3/02, A41D31/00, D06M101/06
[2017/19]
Former International [2015/43]G21F1/12, G21F3/00, G21F1/08, G21F1/10, A41D13/04, A62B17/00, // G21F3/02, A41D31/00
Former International [2015/01]G21F3/00, G21F1/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STRAHLUNGSABSCHIRMUNGSFOLIE[2015/01]
English:RADIATION-SHIELDING SHEET[2015/01]
French:FEUILLE DE BLINDAGE CONTRE LES RAYONNEMENTS[2015/01]
Entry into regional phase20.08.2014Translation filed 
20.08.2014National basic fee paid 
20.08.2014Search fee paid 
20.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
12.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2017Fee for grant paid
06.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.08.2016
Opposition(s)19.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
IE25.02.2018
LU25.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
IE25.02.2018
LU25.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
LU25.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/44]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
NO18.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL18.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]JP2009262553  (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO) [X] 1,2,4-7 * paragraphs [0053] - [0056] - [0065] * [I] 3;
 [XYI]WO2007038238  (XOFT INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 26; claims 8,9,11,17 * [Y] 6 [I] 3;
 [XY]CA2440402  (NORTHROP GRUMMAN NEWPORT NEWS [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 8, line 15 - page 9, line 17 * * page 16, lines 3-12 * [Y] 6
International search[X]JP2004523759  (NORTHROP GRUMMAN NEWPORT NEWS);
 [X]JP3167330U  (NIPPON TANGSTEN CO., LTD.);
 [X]JPS60190898  (SATO AKIRA);
 [X]JP3172240U  (ASWAN CORP.);
 [Y]JP2008175811  (NIPPON TUNGSTEN);
 [A]JP3098317U  (TOKUMITSU KABUSHIKI KAISHA)
ExaminationJP2006009197
 JP2000328483
 US2004004196
by applicantJP2006526434