Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2818313

EP2818313 - LAMINATE INCLUDING TOP COATING LAYER COMPRISING SCALY METAL OXIDE FINE PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Teijin Limited
6-7 Minamihommachi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0054 / JP
[2017/36]
Former [2015/01]For all designated states
Teijin Limited
6-7 Minamihommachi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0054 / JP
For all designated states
Central Japan Railway Company
1-4 Meieki 1-chome
Nakamura-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 450-6101 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / EKINAKA Tatsuya
c/o Teijin Limited.
2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0013 / JP
02 / SUGA Takehiro
c/o Teijin Limited.
2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0013 / JP
03 / KITA Toshio
c/o Teijin Limited.
2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0013 / JP
04 / NIIMI Ryo
c/o Teijin Limited.
2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0013 / JP
05 / TOYOSHIMA Yuta
c/o Teijin Limited.
2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0013 / JP
06 / SHICHI Tetsuya
c/o Central Japan Railway Company
1-4 Meieki 1-chome
Nakamura-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi 450-6101 / JP
07 / YOSHIOKA Daisuke
c/o Central Japan Railway Company
1-4 Meieki 1-chome
Nakamura-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi 450-6101 / JP
08 / YAMASHITA Makoto
c/o Central Japan Railway Company
1-4 Meieki 1-chome
Nakamura-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi 450-6101 / JP
09 / OKAZAKI Sohei
c/o Central Japan Railway Company
1-4 Meieki 1-chome
Nakamura-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi 450-6101 / JP
10 / KANEKO Yuji
c/o Central Japan Railway Company
1-4
Meieki 1-chome
Nakamura-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi 4506101 / JP
 [2015/12]
Former [2015/01]01 / EKINAKA Tatsuya
c/o Teijin Limited.
2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0013 / JP
02 / SUGA Takehiro
c/o Teijin Limited.
2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0013 / JP
03 / KITA Toshio
c/o Teijin Limited.
2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0013 / JP
04 / NIMI Ryo
c/o Teijin Limited.
2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0013 / JP
05 / TOYOSHIMA Yuta
c/o Teijin Limited.
2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0013 / JP
06 / SHICHI Tetsuya
c/o Central Japan Railway Company
1-4 Meieki 1-chome
Nakamura-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi 450-6101 / JP
07 / YOSHIOKA Daisuke
c/o Central Japan Railway Company
1-4 Meieki 1-chome
Nakamura-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi 450-6101 / JP
08 / YAMASHITA Makoto
c/o Central Japan Railway Company
1-4 Meieki 1-chome
Nakamura-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi 450-6101 / JP
09 / OKAZAKI Sohei
c/o Central Japan Railway Company
1-4 Meieki 1-chome
Nakamura-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi 450-6101 / JP
10 / KANEKO Yuji
c/o Central Japan Railway Company
1-4
Meieki 1-chome
Nakamura-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi 4506101 / JP
Representative(s)Adam, Holger
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[2015/01]
Application number, filing date13752448.420.02.2013
[2019/13]
WO2013JP55026
Priority number, dateJP2012003486621.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012034866
JP2012003486721.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012034867
JP2012003486821.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012034868
[2015/01]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013125724
Date:29.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2818313
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2818313
Date:27.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:B05D7/00, B05D3/04, // B05D3/02, B05D3/06, B05D3/14
[2018/46]
Former International [2015/01]B32B5/16, B05D3/06, B32B27/14, C08J7/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LAMINAT MIT EINEM BESCHICHTUNGSÜBERZUG AUS SCHUPPENFÖRMIGEN METALLOXIDFEINPARTIKELN[2015/01]
English:LAMINATE INCLUDING TOP COATING LAYER COMPRISING SCALY METAL OXIDE FINE PARTICLES[2015/01]
French:STRATIFIÉ COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE DE REVÊTEMENT SUPÉRIEURE COMPOSÉE DE FINES PARTICULES ÉCAILLEUSES D'OXYDE MÉTALLIQUE[2015/01]
Entry into regional phase04.08.2014Translation filed 
04.08.2014National basic fee paid 
04.08.2014Search fee paid 
04.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
11.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2019Fee for grant paid
14.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.08.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
12.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
12.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
07.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
14.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
[2019/46]
Former [2019/39]FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1918338  (OTSUKA CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 8,10 * paragraphs [0041] , [0042]; example -; claim - * [I] 1-3,6;
 [XI]EP1860166  (TOKAI RYOKAKU TETSUDO KK [JP]) [X] 8,10 * paragraphs [0039] , [0041] , [0043] , [0048]; example -; claims 15,16,17,18 * [I] 1,2;
 [XI]EP1857499  (OTSUKA CHEM HOLDINGS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 8,10 * paragraph [0008]; example -; claims 1,2 * [I] 1,2;
 [X]US2010166548  (SAYANO AKIO [JP], et al) [X] 8,10 * example 1 *;
 [X]US2001024718  (SASAKI TAKAYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 8,10 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]EP1033347  (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA [JP], et al) [X] 8,10 * paragraphs [0102] , [ 103]; example 12 *;
 [X]EP1491498  (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP]) [X] 8,10 * example -; claims 12,17 *;
 [X]EP1419994  (OTSUKA CHEM HOLDINGS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 8,10 * example 18; claims 9,10 *;
 [X]US2004247878  (IMANAKA YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 15 * example - *;
 [X]EP1283107  (LINTEC CORP [JP]) [X] 15 * example - *
 [X]  - ATSUNORI MATSUDA ET AL, "Preparation of Titania Nanosheet-Precipitated Coatings on Glass Substrates by Treating SiO2-TiO2 Gel Films with Hot Water Under Vibrations", JOURNAL OF SOL-GEL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20040801), vol. 31, no. 1-3, doi:10.1023/B:JSST.0000047993.12165.75, ISSN 1573-4846, pages 229 - 233, XP019212821 [X] 8,10 * example experimental *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/B:JSST.0000047993.12165.75
International search[X]JP2011068122  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO);
 [X]JP2006206841  (OTSUKA CHEMICAL CO LTD);
 [Y]JP2002060689  (NIHON YAMAMURA GLASS CO LTD);
 [Y]JP2005290369  (TOKAI RYOKAKU TETSUDO KK);
 [A]JP2005186035  (NITTETSU STEEL SHEET CORP);
 [A]JP2006043976  (KOKEN KK);
 [A]JP2009095764  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO)
by applicantWO2007105741
 JP2005290369
 JP2003326649
 JP2002129003
 JPH06172508
 JPH0827370
 JP2001055435
 JP2002117580