Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2883275

EP2883275 - FRONT END PARALLEL RESONANT SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2015/25]
Inventor(s)01 / SABOURI, Faramarz
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2015/25]
Representative(s)Wimmer, Hubert
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/25]Wimmer, Hubert
WAGNER & GEYER Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date13753009.309.08.2013
WO2013US54418
Priority number, dateUS20121357089509.08.2012         Original published format: US201213570895
[2015/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014026159
Date:13.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2883275
Date:17.06.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2014
[2015/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/24, H04B1/04
[2015/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
TitleGerman:PARALLELRESONANTER FRONTEND-SCHALTER[2015/25]
English:FRONT END PARALLEL RESONANT SWITCH[2015/25]
French:COMMUTATEUR DE RÉSONANCE PARALLÈLE D'EXTRÉMITÉ AVANT[2015/25]
Entry into regional phase06.03.2015National basic fee paid 
06.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
06.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/25]
02.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.07.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
05.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
08.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]US6393264  (SCHOLZ RALF [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,8-19 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 38 * * figures 1, 2 * [I] 7,20;
 [XI]WO0207337  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]; BRANDT PER OLOF [SE] ERICSSON TELEFON AB) [X] 1,3,4,6,12-16,18,19 * page 5, line 12 - page 9, line 21 * * figures 2, 3 * [I] 7,20;
 [A]WO2009009646  (AXIOM MICRODEVICES INC [US]; QIAO DONGJAING [US]; KEE SCOTT D [US]; AO) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004253939  (CASTANEDA JESUS A [US] ET AL) [A] 1,5 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * figure 4 *