Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2883328

EP2883328 - PROVISIONING-FREE MEMBERLESS GROUP COMMUNICATION SESSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2015/25]
Inventor(s)01 / SHARMA, Sandeep
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / SHUMAN, Mohammed Ataur Rahman
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / SURYAVANSHI, Vijay A.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
04 / MAGGENTI, Mark A.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2015/25]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/25]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date13753018.412.08.2013
WO2013US54544
Priority number, dateUS201261682421P13.08.2012         Original published format: US 201261682421 P
US20131396313709.08.2013         Original published format: US201313963137
[2015/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014028389
Date:20.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2883328
Date:17.06.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2014
[2015/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/18
[2015/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
TitleGerman:PROVISIONSFREIE MITGLIEDSLOSE GRUPPENKOMMUNIKATIONSSITZUNGEN[2015/25]
English:PROVISIONING-FREE MEMBERLESS GROUP COMMUNICATION SESSIONS[2015/25]
French:SESSIONS DE COMMUNICATION DE GROUPE SANS AFFILIATION NI APPROVISIONNEMENT DE SERVICES[2015/25]
Entry into regional phase19.01.2015National basic fee paid 
19.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
19.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.01.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/25]
28.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.03.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/32]
27.03.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
05.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201806   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[I]US2012175416  (GOMEZ MARK H [US] ET AL) [I] 1-48 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0030] *;
 [I]US2012185355  (KILROY KAREN S [US]) [I] 1-48 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0097] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0109] * * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0122] * * paragraph [0125] - paragraph [0126] * * paragraph [0137] * * paragraph [0158] * * paragraph [0164] * * paragraph [0174] - paragraph [0176] * * paragraph [0189] - paragraph [0201] * * paragraph [0240] - paragraph [0242] * * paragraph [0245] - paragraph [0252] * * paragraph [0264] - paragraph [0265] *;
 [I]US2012150729  (ISAACSON THOMAS M [US] ET AL) [I] 1-48 * paragraph [0268] - paragraph [0273] *
by applicantUS7647036