blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2885632

EP2885632 - ELECTROCHEMICAL DEPOSITION AND X-RAY FLUORESCENCE SPECTROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.07.2016
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Element Six Technologies Limited
Global Innovation Centre
Fermi Avenue
Harwell Oxford
Didcot, OX11 0QR / GB
[2015/26]
Inventor(s)01 / NEWTON, Mark Edward
University of Warwick
Department of Chemistry
Warwick Warwickshire CV4 7AL / GB
02 / MACPHERSON, Julie Victoria
University of Warwick
Department of Chemistry
Coventry Warwickshire CV4 7AL / GB
03 / MOLLART, Timothy Peter
Element Six Limited
Kings Ride Park
Ascot Berkshire SL5 8BP / GB
 [2015/26]
Representative(s)Atkinson, Ian Anthony, et al
Element Six Limited
Group Intellectual Property
Harwell Campus
Fermi Avenue
Didcot Oxfordshire OX11 0QR / GB
[2015/26]
Application number, filing date13753295.809.08.2013
WO2013EP66756
Priority number, dateGB2012001444814.08.2012         Original published format: GB 201214448
US201261682849P14.08.2012         Original published format: US 201261682849 P
[2015/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014026932
Date:20.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2885632
Date:24.06.2015
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.02.2014
ClassificationIPC:G01N23/223, G01N27/42, G01N27/48, G01N27/30, G01N27/49
[2015/26]
CPC:
G01N23/223 (EP,GB,US); G01N23/2204 (GB,US); G01N27/27 (US);
G01N27/30 (EP,US); G01N27/308 (GB); G01N27/42 (EP,US);
G01N27/48 (EP,GB,US); G01N27/49 (EP,GB,US); G01N2223/076 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/26]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROCHEMISCHE ABSCHEIDUNG UND RÖNTGENFLUORESZENZSPEKTROSKOPIE[2015/26]
English:ELECTROCHEMICAL DEPOSITION AND X-RAY FLUORESCENCE SPECTROSCOPY[2015/26]
French:DÉPÔT ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE ET SPECTROSCOPIE À FLUORESCENCE DE RAYONS X[2015/26]
Entry into regional phase02.02.2015National basic fee paid 
02.02.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
02.02.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/26]
02.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/33]
07.04.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/33]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2010163430  (HALL CLIVE E [GB], et al) [Y] 1-23 * paragraphs [0002] , [0040] - [0042] * * figure 3 *;
 [Y]  - TOURILLON G ET AL, "In-plane structural and electronic characteristics of underpotentially deposited copper on gold (100) probed by in-situ X-ray absorption spectroscopy", JOURNAL OF ELECTROANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY AND INTERFACIAL ELECTROCHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 289, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/0022-0728(90)87221-5, ISSN 0022-0728, (19900824), pages 263 - 278, (19900824), XP026534699 [Y] 1-23 * abstract * * page 265, paragraph 3 - page 268, paragraph 2 * * page 271, paragraph 5 - page 273, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,2,5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0728(90)87221-5
 [A]  - SIMONE GRIESEL ET AL, "Electro-deposition as a sample preparation technique for total-reflection X-ray fluorescence analysis", SPECTROCHIMICA ACTA PART B: ATOMIC SPECTROSCOPY, (20011101), vol. 56, no. 11, doi:10.1016/S0584-8547(01)00319-6, ISSN 0584-8547, pages 2107 - 2115, XP055031066 [A] 21-23 * abstract * * page 2108, column left, paragraph 4 - page 2109, column left, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0584-8547(01)00319-6
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.