Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2821249

EP2821249 - TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 31.10.2018  [2018/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2017/13]
Former [2015/02]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / FUDEMOTO, Hiroyuki
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
10-1 Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
02 / HARADA, Takashi
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
10-1 Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
03 / GAO, Tong
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
10-1 Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
04 / HONJO, Atsuko
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
10-1 Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2015/02]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/02]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date13754294.028.02.2013
[2017/13]
WO2013JP55583
Priority number, dateJP2012004464529.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012044645
[2015/02]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013129628
Date:06.09.2013
Language:JA
[2013/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2821249
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2821249
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:B60C5/01, B60C1/00, C08L77/02, C08L101/12
[2016/40]
Former International [2015/02]B60C5/01, B60C1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:REIFEN[2015/02]
English:TIRE[2015/02]
French:PNEUMATIQUE[2015/02]
Entry into regional phase26.09.2014Translation filed 
26.09.2014National basic fee paid 
26.09.2014Search fee paid 
26.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
05.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2017Fee for grant paid
31.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.10.2016
Opposition(s)03.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
[2018/44]
Former [2018/25]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1995275  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0004] , [0007] , [0017] , [0019] *
International search[X]JP2003104006  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD);
 [X]JP2011162167  (INOAC GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO KK)
by applicantJP2003104008
 JPH03143701
 JPH05331256
 US4141927
 JP2622678B
 JP2606912B
 JP2606914B
 JP2596565B
 JP2596566B
 JP2598478B
 JP2598536B
 JP2599171B
 JPH0948852
 JP2565556B
 JP2564636B
 JP2564637B
 JP2563548B
 JP2563547B
 JP2558341B
 JP2558339B
 JP2834580B
 JPH1148264
 JPH1129658
 JP2003238744
 JP2012044645