Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2822217

EP2822217 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.09.2016
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.11.2016  [2016/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2015/02]
Inventor(s)01 / SAKUMOTO, Koichi
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / SHIRAI, Taizo
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
03 / KAMIO, Kazuya
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2015/02]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/02]Jackson, Jonathan Andrew
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date13754371.608.02.2013
WO2013JP53081
Priority number, dateJP2012004668502.03.2012         Original published format: JP 2012046685
[2015/02]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013129084
Date:06.09.2013
Language:JA
[2013/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2822217
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/32
[2015/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
TitleGerman:INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM[2015/02]
English:INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM[2015/02]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, ET PROGRAMME[2015/02]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2014Translation filed 
20.08.2014National basic fee paid 
20.08.2014Search fee paid 
20.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
17.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
10.05.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/44]
13.06.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1758020  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,3 * sentence 57, paragraph 47 - paragraph 57; figures 11,12 *;
 [Y]  - KOICHI SAKUMOTO ET AL, Public-Key Identification Schemes Based on Multivariate Quadratic Polynomials, ADVANCES IN COMMUNICATION NETWORKING : 20TH EUNICE/IFIP EG 6.2, 6.6 INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, RENNES, FRANCE, SEPTEMBER 1-5, 2014, REVISED SELECTED PAPERS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE , ISSN 1611-3349], SPRINGER VERLAG, DE, PAGE(S) 706 - 723, (20110814), ISSN 0302-9743, ISBN 978-3-540-89964-8, XP019161037 [Y] 1-15 * sections 1, 3, 4 and 7 *
 [Y]  - CÃ'ME BERBAIN ET AL, Efficient Implementations of Multivariate Quadratic Systems, SELECTED AREAS IN CRYPTOGRAPHY; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 174 - 187, (20060817), ISBN 978-3-540-74461-0, XP019098542 [Y] 1-15 * section 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-74462-7_13
 [T]  - DAVID ARDITTI ET AL, "Compact FPGA implementations of QUAD", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2ND ACM SYMPOSIUM ON INFORMATION, COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATIONS SECURITY , ASIACCS '07, New York, New York, USA, (20070101), doi:10.1145/1229285.1229323, ISBN 978-1-59-593574-8, page 347, XP055217024 [T] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1229285.1229323
International search[Y]WO2005124537  (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al);
 [Y]  - KOICHI SAKUMOTO ET AL., "Public-Key Identification Schemes Based on Multivariate Quadratic Polynomials", ADVANCES IN CRYPTOLOGY- CRYPTO 2011 31ST ANNUAL CRYPTOLOGY CONFERENCE, SANTA BARBARA, CA, USA, (20110806), vol. 6841, pages 706 - 723, XP019161037
 [Y]  - TSUGIO NAKAMURA ET AL., "Pasokon de Jisshu Shinagara Manaberu Ango no Shikumi to Jisso, first edition", KABUSHIKI KAISHA NIPPON RIKO SHUPPANKAI, (20090630), pages 208 - 212, XP008174533
 [Y]  - COME BERBAIN ET AL.XP019098542, "Efficient Implementations of Multivariate Quadratic Systems", SELECTED AREAS IN CRYPTOGRAPHY13TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, SAC 2006, MONTREAL, CANADA, (20070817), vol. 4356, pages 174 - 187

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-74462-7_13
by applicant   - JACQUES PATARIN, "Asymmetric Cryptography with a Hidden Monomial", CRYPTO, (1996), pages 45 - 60, XP019194414
    - "QUARTZ, 128-Bit Long Digital Signatures", PATARIN, J.; COURTOIS, N.; GOUBIN, L., Topics in Cryptology - CT-RSA 2001, SPRINGER-VERLAG., (200104), vol. 2020, pages 282 - 297
    - KOICHI SAKUMOTO; TAIZO SHIRAI; HARUNAGA HIWATARI, "Public-Key Identification Schemes Based on Multivariate Quadratic Polynomials", CRYPTO 2011, LNCS, (2011), vol. 6841, pages 706 - 723, XP019161037