Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2819791

EP2819791 - VACUUM ASSISTED CONTAINMENT CLEANING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Campbell, Keith S.
60 North Road
East Kingston, New Hampshire 03827 / US
[2015/02]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2015/02]
Representative(s)Cabinet Chaillot
16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre
B.P. 74
92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
[2019/19]
Former [2015/02]Chaillot, Geneviève
Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74
92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date13754527.326.02.2013
[2019/19]
WO2013US27736
Priority number, dateUS20121340712328.02.2012         Original published format: US201213407123
[2015/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013130430
Date:06.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2819791
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013
[2015/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2819791
Date:08.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:B08B5/04, B08B9/20, B08B3/02, B08B5/02, B08B11/02, B08B3/08, B08B3/10, F26B21/00
[2016/16]
Former International [2015/02]B08B5/04, B08B9/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VAKUUMUNTERSTÜTZTE SICHERHEITSBEHÄLTERREINIGUNG[2015/02]
English:VACUUM ASSISTED CONTAINMENT CLEANING[2015/02]
French:NETTOYAGE DE CONFINEMENT SOUS VIDE[2015/02]
Entry into regional phase23.09.2014National basic fee paid 
23.09.2014Search fee paid 
23.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
18.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
22.03.2019Fee for grant paid
22.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.10.2018
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
22.03.2019Request for further processing filed
22.03.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.04.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL08.05.2019
ES08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
HR08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
LV08.05.2019
NL08.05.2019
RS08.05.2019
SE08.05.2019
BG08.08.2019
NO08.08.2019
GR09.08.2019
PT08.09.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/50]AL08.05.2019
ES08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
HR08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
LV08.05.2019
NL08.05.2019
RS08.05.2019
SE08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
GR09.08.2019
PT08.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL08.05.2019
ES08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
HR08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
NL08.05.2019
SE08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
PT08.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
SE08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
PT08.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
Documents cited:Search[IY]US2011308033  (CAMPBELL KEITH S [US]) [I] 1,2,4,5,9,11-13,15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0097] - [0105] - [0111]; figures 1-12G; claims 1-6 * [Y] 3,6;
 [YA]EP2033718  (TECHTRONIC IND CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 3,6 * paragraphs [0050] - [0135]; figures 1,8a,8b * [A] 1,2,5;
 [A]US2010125969  (GENNA MICHAEL [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0039]; figures 1,2; claims 1-12 *;
 [A]DE9115091U  (BORMANN, LUDWIG) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 6, line 12; figure 1; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]US2002162187  (KELLER KRIS D [US]) [A] 2 * paragraphs [0020] - [0308]; figures 1-28 *
International search[X]WO2011159990  (CAMPBELL KEITH S [US]);
 [Y]US2009133721  (CAMPBELL KEITH S [US]);
 [A]JP2545048Y  (NIKKISO CO.);
 [A]JP2003245613  (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY);
 [A]EP0038724  (BISSELL INC [US])
by applicantUS2011308033