Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2820723

EP2820723 - CONNECTOR HAVING WIRELESS CONTROL CAPABILITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.11.2017  [2017/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ideal Industries, Inc.
Becker Place
Sycamore, IL 60178 / US
[2015/02]
Inventor(s)01 / DIDONATO, David
39W202 Warner Lane
Geneva, Illinois 60134 / US
02 / BELLO, Nolan
1431 Hartsburg Lane
North Aurora, Illinois 60542-8950 / US
03 / KESWANI, Sushil N.
1346 Devonshire Dr. S.
Sycamore, Illinois 60178 / US
 [2015/02]
Representative(s)Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/02]Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstraße 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date13754628.926.02.2013
WO2013US27739
Priority number, dateUS201261606129P02.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261606129 P
US20121359137122.08.2012         Original published format: US201213591371
[2015/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013130432
Date:06.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2820723
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013
[2015/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/703, H05B37/02, H02J13/00
[2016/47]
Former International [2015/02]H01R13/703
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
TitleGerman:VERBINDER MIT DRAHTLOSEN STEUERUNGSFUNKTIONEN[2015/02]
English:CONNECTOR HAVING WIRELESS CONTROL CAPABILITIES[2015/02]
French:CONNECTEUR QUI PRÉSENTE DES CAPACITÉS DE COMMANDE SANS FIL[2015/02]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2014National basic fee paid 
13.08.2014Search fee paid 
13.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
23.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/48]
30.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2011150126  (LAMON KEITH [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0007] - [0011]; figure 2 * [Y] 14,15;
 [I]WO2010042219  (DIGITAL OPTICS INTERNATIONAL L [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0009] , [0012] , [0022] - [0024] - [0026] , [0027] , [0028] , [0052]; figures 1A,1B,3A,3B *;
 [Y]US2005231134  (SID ALBERTO [US]) [Y] 14,15 * figure 5, *
International search[X]US2007123075  (INSALACO ROBERT W [US], et al);
 [Y]US6262901  (SIMOPOULOS ANASTASTIOS V [US]);
 [Y]US2010118574  (BOURGEAU EDWARD P [US]);
 [Y]US6040987  (KUDO KENJI [JP], et al);
 [Y]US2008211347  (WRIGHT JOSHUA ISAAC [US], et al);
 [Y]US2008161073  (PARK JOONBAE [KR], et al);
 [Y]US7741974  (KUO CHIH-CHENG [US]);
 [Y]US2004201491  (WENG LINSONG [TW])