Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2821748

EP2821748 - RANGE FINDING DEVICE AND RANGE FINDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.06.2019
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
2 Takara-cho
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
[2019/31]
Former [2015/02]For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd
2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OKI, Takahiko
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
 [2015/02]
Representative(s)Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
[2019/31]
Former [2015/02]Hoefer & Partner
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date13754683.426.02.2013
[2019/31]
WO2013JP54948
Priority number, dateJP2012004523801.03.2012         Original published format: JP 2012045238
[2015/02]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013129387
Date:06.09.2013
Language:JA
[2013/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2821748
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2821748
Date:31.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01C3/06, G01S17/32, G01S17/48, G01S7/491
[2015/17]
Former International [2015/02]G01C3/06, G01S17/32, G01S17/48
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ENTFERNUNGSFINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ENTFERNUNGSFINDUNGSVERFAHREN[2015/02]
English:RANGE FINDING DEVICE AND RANGE FINDING METHOD[2015/02]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR TROUVER UNE PLAGE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR TROUVER UNE PLAGE[2015/02]
Entry into regional phase01.08.2014Translation filed 
01.08.2014National basic fee paid 
01.08.2014Search fee paid 
01.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
01.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
28.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2019Fee for grant paid
19.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.05.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2008237445  (IKENO RYOHEI [JP], et al) [X] 7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] - [0020] - [0076] - [0083] * [A] 1-6,9;
 [A]DE4312186  (SICK OPTIK ELEKTRONIK ERWIN [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 4, line 33 - line 41 * * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 12 *;
 [A]JP2009186258  (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-9 * abstract *
International search[Y]JP2009186258  (NISSAN MOTOR);
 [Y]JP2008051759  (NISSAN MOTOR);
 [Y]JPH04166788  (JAPAN RADIO CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH0642960  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD);
 [A]JP2008241435  (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD);
 [A]JPH0972736  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [AE]JP2013024636  (NISSAN MOTOR)
by applicantJP2010107448