Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2821748 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2821748



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 273
12.08.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
04.07.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.06.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.06.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
19.06.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
19.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.05.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
07.05.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
07.05.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.05.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 39
07.05.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 39
02.04.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
29.02.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.08.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
28.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
28.08.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
28.08.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
28.08.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
28.08.2015 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
28.05.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.04.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
25.03.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.03.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
25.03.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
05.03.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
27.02.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.12.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
07.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.09.2014 Translation of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
09.09.2014 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 8
01.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
01.08.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
01.08.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
01.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
01.08.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
01.08.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
01.08.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
01.08.2014 Description Search / examination 27
01.08.2014 Drawings Search / examination 9
01.08.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
01.08.2014 Translation of the annexes to the International Preliminary Examination Report Search / examination 4
11.07.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
24.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
11.09.2013 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
06.09.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
06.09.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
06.09.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 33