Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2821748


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.06.2019 (Expected) grant published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
25.06.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
25.06.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
25.06.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.05.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.09.2015 Amendment by applicant
08.05.2015 Change - extension states published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
20.03.2015 Change - classification published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
20.03.2015 Change - classification published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
20.03.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
06.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
05.12.2014 Request for examination filed published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
04.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.08.2014 Amendment by applicant
02.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
11.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
09.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication