Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2821748 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380011961 EP13754683



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10436902Global Dossier 08.10.2019B2
US2015012244 08.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013JP54948 26.02.2013
JP2012045238 01.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5800082BGlobal Dossier 28.10.2015B2
JPWO2013129387 30.07.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013JP54948 26.02.2013
JP2014502244 26.02.2013
JP2012045238 01.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104160243BGlobal Dossier 01.03.2017B
CN104160243 19.11.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2013JP54948 26.02.2013
JP2012045238 01.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2821748Global Dossier 31.07.2019B1
EP2821748 22.04.2015A4
EP2821748 07.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013JP54948 26.02.2013
JP2012045238 01.03.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013129387Global Dossier 06.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
JP2012045238 01.03.2012