Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2820034

EP2820034 - MODIFIED ADIPONECTIN POLYPEPTIDES AND THEIR USES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.06.2016
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.07.2016  [2016/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ambrx, Inc.
10975 North Torrey Pines Road, Suite 100
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
[2015/02]
Inventor(s)01 / KRAYNOV, Vadim
5457 White Oak Lane
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
02 / PUTNAM, Anna-maria, A.
11522 Cesped Drive
San Diego, CA 92124 / US
 [2015/02]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2015/02]
Application number, filing date13755219.627.02.2013
WO2013US28106
Priority number, dateUS201261605086P29.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261605086 P
[2015/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013130676
Date:06.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2820034
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013
[2015/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/00
[2015/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
Extension statesBA29.09.2014
ME29.09.2014
TitleGerman:MODIFIZIERTE ADIPONECTINPOLYPEPTIDE UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN[2015/02]
English:MODIFIED ADIPONECTIN POLYPEPTIDES AND THEIR USES[2015/02]
French:POLYPEPTIDES D'ADIPONECTINE MODIFIÉS ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2015/02]
Entry into regional phase29.09.2014National basic fee paid 
29.09.2014Search fee paid 
29.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
14.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/28]
24.02.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2016/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2007008937  (XENCOR INC [US]; ZALEVSKY JONATHAN [US]; NGUYEN DUC-HANH THI [US]; MOO) [X] 1-18 * Whole doc., in particular example 11 *;
 [X]US2007054359  (ZALEVSKY JONATHAN [US] ET AL) [X] 1-18 * Whole doc., in particular example 19, para. [0205-0206] *;
 [XP]WO2012142142  (UNIV TEMPLE [US]; OTVOS LASZLO [US]; SURMACZ EVA [US]) [XP] 1-18 * Whole doc., in particular para. [0047, 0051, 0094, 00105] *;
 [X]WO2007146171  (TUFTS COLLEGE [US]; LEE DAVID H [US]; RILLAHAN CORY [US]; SUZUKI SHINJ) [X] 17,18 * Whole doc., in particular para. [0025, 0029] *;
 [X]  - WAKI H ET AL, "Impaired Multimerization of Human Adiponectin Mutants Associated with Diabetes", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, US, (20031010), vol. 278, no. 41, doi:10.1074/JBC.M300365200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 40352 - 40363, XP002988190 [X] 17,18 * Whole doc., e.g. p.40356, col. 1, l.3; Fig.6; Table 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M300365200
 [A]  - DEITERS A ET AL, "Site-specific PEGylation of proteins containing unnatural amino acids", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20041206), vol. 14, no. 23, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2004.09.059, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 5743 - 5745, XP004611112 [A] 1-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2004.09.059
International search[X]US2006286035  (SAUDAN ET AL.);
 [Y]US2010298212  (MIAO ET AL.);
 [A]WO2008121009  (COOPER ET AL.);
 [A]US2006052292  (RASMUSSEN ET AL.);
 [A]US2006281151  (ZALEVSKY ET AL.);
 [A]US2007015909  (CASH ET AL.)