Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2820614

EP2820614 - APPARATUS AND METHOD OF PROVIDING MEDICAL DATA BASED ON A HANDOVER OF A MEDICAL SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2015/02]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Jun-Hyung
302 Donghovill
983-5 Yeongtong-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-470 / KR
02 / LEE, Jong-Hyo
304-1603 Mujigaemaeul Sinhan APT.
Gumi-dong
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-708 / KR
 [2015/02]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/02]Jenkins, Richard Gavin , et al
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date13755582.727.02.2013
WO2013KR01580
Priority number, dateKR2012002031928.02.2012         Original published format: KR 20120020319
[2015/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013129839
Date:06.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2820614
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013
[2015/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00, G06Q50/22, A61B5/00, H04L29/08, H04W84/18, H04W76/00, H04W36/30, H04W12/08
[2017/08]
Former International [2015/02]G06Q50/22
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG MEDIZINISCHER DATEN BASIEREND AUF EINER ÜBERGABE EINES MEDIZINISCHEN SENSORS[2015/02]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD OF PROVIDING MEDICAL DATA BASED ON A HANDOVER OF A MEDICAL SENSOR[2015/02]
French:APPAREIL ET MÉTHODE PERMETTANT D'OBTENIR DES DONNÉES MÉDICALES PAR UN TRANSFERT DES SOINS D'UN CAPTEUR MÉDICAL[2015/02]
Entry into regional phase20.08.2014National basic fee paid 
20.08.2014Search fee paid 
20.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
24.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/49]
03.07.2019Date of oral proceedings
22.07.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/49]
22.07.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP19196519.3
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
01.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
01.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2185065  (CARDIAC PACEMAKERS INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2008001735  (TRAN BAO [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[Y]KR20080004124  (OH HAE SEOK [KR], et al);
 [Y]KR100963698B  (NETBLUE CO LTD [KR]);
 [A]WO2010077851  (CORVENTIS INC [US], et al);
 [A]JP2003303239  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD, et al);
 [A]US8121673  (TRAN BAO [US])