Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2888186

EP2888186 - CONVEYOR, PACKAGING SYSTEM WITH SUCH A CONVEYOR AND METHOD FOR ROTATING A PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/27]CONVEYOR AND METHOD FOR ROTATING A PRODUCT
[2016/17]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.02.2017  [2017/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cryovac, Inc.
100 Rogers Bridge Road
Duncan, South Carolina 29334 / US
[2015/27]
Inventor(s)01 / BENEDETTI, Giulio
Via Matteotti Solbiate Arno
Varese / IT
02 / PALUMBO, Riccardo
Via Pertossi 12 28041 Arona
Novara / IT
 [2015/27]
Representative(s)Jackson, Martin Peter
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2015/27]
Application number, filing date13756052.022.08.2013
WO2013EP67486
Priority number, dateEP2012027512122.08.2012         Original published format: EP 12275121
[2015/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014029855
Date:27.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2888186
Date:01.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2014
[2015/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:B65G17/08, B65G47/244
[2015/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/27]
TitleGerman:FÖRDERER, VERPACKUNGSYSTEM MIT EINEM SOLCHEN FÖRDERER UND VERFAHREN ZUM DREHEN EINES PRODUKTS[2016/17]
English:CONVEYOR, PACKAGING SYSTEM WITH SUCH A CONVEYOR AND METHOD FOR ROTATING A PRODUCT[2016/17]
French:TRANSPORTEUR, SYSTÈME DE CONDITIONNEMENT AVEC UN TEL TRANSPORTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN ROTATION D'UN PRODUIT[2016/17]
Former [2015/27]FÖRDERER UND VERFAHREN ZUM DREHEN EINES PRODUKTS
Former [2015/27]CONVEYOR AND METHOD FOR ROTATING A PRODUCT
Former [2015/27]TRANSPORTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN ROTATION D'UN PRODUIT
Entry into regional phase10.12.2014National basic fee paid 
10.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/27]
07.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/07]
26.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2017/07]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.04.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201604   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0546424  (BOBST SA [CH]) [A] 1,15 * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 49; figure - *;
 [A]US6571937  (COSTANZO MARK [US], et al) [A] 1,15 * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 53; figure - *;
 [A]US4494645  (HESSLING HEINZ W [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 6 - line 61; figure - *;
 [A]EP0590664  (ADVANCED PULVER SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 24 - column 5, line 35; figure - *;
 [A]US2012018280  (HAMAO TAMOTSU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, column 1, line 28 - column 2, line 43; figure - *
by applicantUS2009039592
 GB2203402
 US6520314