Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2888796

EP2888796 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR POWER OUTPUT CONTROL IN WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.12.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 22.01.2020  [2020/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WiTricity Corporation
57 Water Street
Watertown, MA 02472 / US
[2019/15]
Former [2015/27]For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KEELING, Nicholas A.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / BEAVER, Jonathan
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / KISSIN, Michael
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / VAN BOHEEMEN, Edward
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2015/27]
Representative(s)Tomkins & Co
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[2020/04]
Former [2015/27]Catesby, Olivia Joanne , et al
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date13756243.521.08.2013
[2020/04]
WO2013US56032
Priority number, dateUS201261692908P24.08.2012         Original published format: US 201261692908 P
US20131374067914.01.2013         Original published format: US201313740679
[2015/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014031773
Date:27.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2888796
Date:01.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2014
[2015/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2888796
Date:22.01.2020
Language:EN
[2020/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04B5/00, H02J50/40, H02J50/12, H02J50/90, H02J50/80, B60L53/12, B60L53/30, B60L53/36, B60L55/00, B60L53/63, B60L53/65, H02J5/00, H02J7/02
[2019/35]
Former International [2015/27]H02J5/00, B60L11/18, H02J7/02, H02J17/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSGANGSLEISTUNGSREGELUNG IN DRAHTLOSEN LEISTUNGSÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEMEN[2015/27]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR POWER OUTPUT CONTROL IN WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER SYSTEMS[2015/27]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE SORTIE ÉLECTRIQUE DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE TRANSFERT ÉLECTRIQUE SANS FIL[2015/27]
Entry into regional phase26.01.2015National basic fee paid 
26.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/27]
29.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2019Fee for grant paid
13.12.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.12.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.08.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
05.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2004218406  (JANG YUNGTAEK [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,10-13,15,17-21,23 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010]; figure 4; claim 15 * [Y] 5,6,8,9,14,16,22,24;
 [Y]US2012169137  (LISI GIANPAOLO [US], et al) [Y] 5,6,8,9,14,16,22,24 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0107] *