Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2888328

EP2888328 - STRUCTURAL ADHESIVE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2015/27]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ELGIMIABI, Sohaib
Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1
41453 Neuss / DE
02 / CURA, Elisabeth
Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1
41453 Neuss / DE
03 / KOCH, Bernhard H.
Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1
41453 Neuss / DE
04 / YAVUZ, Nurettin
Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1
41453 Neuss / DE
 [2015/27]
Representative(s)Hettstedt, Stephan
3M Deutschland GmbH
3M Office for Intellectual Property Counsel
Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1
41453 Neuss / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/27]Gabriel, Kiroubagaranne
3M Belgium B.V.B.A./S.P.R.L.
Hermeslaan 7
1831 Diegem / BE
Application number, filing date13756257.522.08.2013
WO2013US56161
Priority number, dateEP2012018157823.08.2012         Original published format: EP 12181578
[2015/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014031838
Date:27.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2888328
Date:01.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2014
[2015/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:C09J7/00, C09J163/00, C08G59/18, C08K5/00, B21D39/02
[2015/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/27]
TitleGerman:HAFTSTRUKTURFOLIE[2015/27]
English:STRUCTURAL ADHESIVE FILM[2015/27]
French:FILM ADHÉSIF STRUCTURAL[2015/27]
Entry into regional phase09.03.2015National basic fee paid 
09.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
09.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/27]
22.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.06.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
27.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.01.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.01.2018
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
27.08.2018Request for further processing filed
27.08.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.10.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[ID]WO2007014039  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [ID] 1-17 * page 2, line 24 - line 29 * * page 4, line 9 - line 11 * * page 4, line 27 - line 31 * * page 14, line 20 - line 22 * * page 21; examples 1, 3, 4; table 2 * * claims 1, 9 *;
 [XI]US2012121878  (BILCAI EUGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-11,13,14,16,17 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0100] * * claim 1 * [I] 12,15;
 [XI]US2007116961  (CONNELL GLEN [US], et al) [X] 1-7,16 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] * * page 4; table 1 * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] * * page 5; table 2 * * claims 1, 8 * [I] 12,15;
 [A]WO02079337  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 2, line 19 - line 25 * * page 3, line 8 - line 10 * * page 10, line 20 - line 32 * * page 11, line 5 - line 8 * * page 13, line 15 - line 17 * * page 13, line 18 - line 20 * * page 14, line 24 - line 27 * * page 15, line 17 - line 26 * * page 15, line 31 * * page 22, line 9 - line 11 * * page 54; examples PE-1, PE-2, PE-3; table 3 * * page 55; examples EE-1, EE-2, EE-3, EE-4; table 4 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO2007025007  (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 1, line 20 - line 22 * * page 3, line 26 - line 29 * * page 4, line 8 - line 10 * * page 34, line 5 - page 35, line 11 * * page 35, line 19 - page 36, line 7 * * claims 1, 24, 25 *;
 [I]EP2468794  (SIKA TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [I] 16 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0088] * * claims 1, 5, 9 *;
 [XPI]EP2529856  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [XP] 1-11,13,14,16,17 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053]; examples 1-4; table 2 * [I] 12,15
 [L]  - "PKHP-200: Micronized PKHH Grade, 110 micron average", (20130103), pages 1 - 1, URL: http://www.phenoxy.com/products/pkhp-200.html, (20130103), XP055048617 [L] 1-17 * tables PKHP-200 Typical Properties *