blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2878075

EP2878075 - DEVICE FOR DYNAMICALLY ADJUSTING THE VOLTAGE OF AN ELECTRICAL NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.06.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2020Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.07.2020  [2020/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRANSFIX
Zone Industrielle Toulon Est
636 avenue de Draguignan
83130 La Garde / FR
[2015/23]
Inventor(s)01 / TRIFIGNY, Philippe
Chemin des Turcos Domaine Muscatelle Figeac
F-83210 Belgentier / FR
02 / FALTERMEIER, Jean-Francis
110 impasse des Andoulins
F-83210 Sollies-toucas / FR
 [2015/23]
Representative(s)Novagraaf Technologies
Bâtiment O2
2, rue Sarah Bernhardt
CS90017
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR
[2015/23]
Application number, filing date13756607.126.07.2013
WO2013FR51810
Priority number, dateFR2012005727426.07.2012         Original published format: FR 1257274
[2015/23]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2014016532
Date:30.01.2014
Language:FR
[2014/05]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2878075
Date:03.06.2015
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.09.2014
ClassificationIPC:H02M5/12, H01F29/04, H02J3/12, H02P13/06, H02J3/18
[2015/23]
CPC:
H02M5/12 (EP,US); H02J13/00002 (EP,US); H02J3/12 (EP,US);
H02J3/1807 (EP,US); H02J3/1878 (EP,US); H02P13/06 (EP);
Y02E40/30 (EP); Y02E40/70 (EP); Y02E60/00 (EP);
Y04S10/22 (EP); Y04S10/30 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/23]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR DYNAMISCHEN ANPASSUNG DER SPANNUNG EINES ELEKTRISCHEN NETZWERKS[2015/23]
English:DEVICE FOR DYNAMICALLY ADJUSTING THE VOLTAGE OF AN ELECTRICAL NETWORK[2015/23]
French:DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE DYNAMIQUE DE LA TENSION D'UN RESEAU ELECTRIQUE[2015/23]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2014National basic fee paid 
11.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/23]
31.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2020Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2020/31]
25.02.2020Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2020/31]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201907   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]FR1188093  (FORGES ATELIERS CONST ELECTR) [A] 1-11 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE2753464  (TRANSFORMATOREN UNION AG) [A] 4,5 * figures 1-4 ** page 9, lines 14-24 *;
 [A]JPS57207314  (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-11 * figure 1 *;
 [A]KR100926968B  (ATO ELEC CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-11 * figures 4a-4d,5a-5d *;
 [A]EP2219277  (VISERGE LTD [IE]) [A] 1-11 * figure 2 *;
 [XI]DE102010040969  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0006] - [0008] - [0010] - [0016] - [0019] , [0028] , [0029] , [0031] - [0045] - [0047] , [0048] * [I] 4,5,7,9-11;
 [A]  - JOAQUÍN VAQUERO LÓPEZ ET AL, "Analysis of Fast Onload Multitap-Changing Clamped-Hard-Switching AC Stabilizers", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER DELIVERY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20060401), vol. 21, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TPWRD.2005.859298, ISSN 0885-8977, pages 852 - 861, XP001546368 [A] 1-11 * figure 1b *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPWRD.2005.859298
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.