Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2822599 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2822599



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 206
23.11.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
08.11.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 1
26.07.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
14.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.06.2016 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
08.12.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
19.11.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.11.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 7
19.11.2015 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
19.11.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 7
12.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.10.2015 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
03.08.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
03.08.2015 Partial European search report Search / examination 5
17.07.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
27.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.04.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
27.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
27.04.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
27.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.12.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
26.11.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
26.11.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
26.11.2014 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 18
26.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
26.11.2014 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
24.10.2014 Deficiencies in sequence listing Search / examination 2
16.10.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
14.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.10.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
22.09.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
16.07.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
01.10.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 41
12.09.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
12.09.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 62