Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2822599


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.11.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
25.07.2016 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
06.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.11.2015 Change - classification published on  23.12.2015  [2015/52]
20.11.2015 Change - classification published on  23.12.2015  [2015/52]
20.11.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  23.12.2015  [2015/52]
31.07.2015 Change - classification published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
31.07.2015 Change - classification published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
08.05.2015 Change - extension states published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
30.04.2015 Amendment by applicant
18.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  14.01.2015  [2015/03]
12.12.2014 Request for examination filed published on  14.01.2015  [2015/03]
30.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
04.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
24.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
13.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication