Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2822599

EP2822599 - VACCINE FORMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.12.2016  [2016/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Duke University
2812 Erwin Road
Durham, NC 27705 / US
[2015/03]
Inventor(s)01 / MOODY, M., Anthony
Duke University
Durham, NC 27710 / US
02 / HAYNES, Barton, F.
Duke University
Durham, NC 27710 / US
 [2015/03]
Representative(s)Atkinson, Peter Birch
Marks & Clerk LLP
1 New York Street
Manchester M1 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/03]Atkinson, Peter Birch
Marks & Clerk LLP
1 New York Street
Manchester, M1 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date13757076.805.03.2013
WO2013US29164
Priority number, dateUS201261606881P05.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261606881 P
[2015/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013134293
Date:12.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2822599
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013
[2015/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR12.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K48/00, A61K38/17, A61K38/16, A61K31/18, A61K39/12, A61K39/39
[2015/36]
Former International [2015/03]A61K48/00, A61K38/17, A61K38/16, A61K31/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/03]
TitleGerman:IMPFSTOFFFORMULIERUNG[2015/03]
English:VACCINE FORMULATION[2015/03]
French:VACCIN[2015/03]
Entry into regional phase03.10.2014National basic fee paid 
03.10.2014Search fee paid 
03.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/03]
27.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.06.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/50]
26.07.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2016/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[I]CN101850117  (NAT CT FOR VETERINARY BIOLOG ENGINEERING RES) [I] 1,4-14 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0032] *;
 [Y]WO2008153541  (INFECTIOUS DISEASE RES INST [US]; REED STEVEN G [US]; CARTER DARRICK [) [Y] 6,7,13,14 * example 15 * * example 3 *;
 [IY]WO2011106100  (UNIV DUKE [US]; HAYNES BARTON F [US]; LIAO HUA-XIN [US]; TOMARAS GEORG) [I] 8-10 * claim 19 * * page 19 * [Y] 6,7,11-14;
 [A]  - BARBARA C BAUDNER ET AL, "MF59 Emulsion Is an Effective Delivery System for a Synthetic TLR4 Agonist (E6020)", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NL, (20090303), vol. 26, no. 6, doi:10.1007/S11095-009-9859-5, ISSN 1573-904X, pages 1477 - 1485, XP019686195 [A] 1,4-14 * figure 2. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11095-009-9859-5
 [A]  - MA R ET AL, "Additive effects of CpG ODN and R-848 as adjuvants on augmenting immune responses to HBsAg vaccination", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, vol. 361, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.BBRC.2007.07.028, ISSN 0006-291X, (20070921), pages 537 - 542, (20070806), XP027016351 [A] 1,4-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2007.07.028
 [A]  - NAPOLITANI GIORGIO ET AL, "Selected Toll-like receptor agonist combinations synergistically trigger a T helper type 1-polarizing program in dendritic cells", NATURE IMMUNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20050801), vol. 6, no. 8, doi:10.1038/NI1223, ISSN 1529-2908, pages 769 - 776, XP002442459 [A] 1,4-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ni1223
 [XY]  - BALDWIN S L ET AL, "Intradermal immunization improves protective efficacy of a novel TB vaccine candidate", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, vol. 27, no. 23, doi:10.1016/J.VACCINE.2009.03.018, ISSN 0264-410X, (20090518), pages 3063 - 3071, (20090326), XP026058724 [X] 2,3,6-13 * figure 1 * [Y] 4,5,14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2009.03.018
 [A]  - BALDWIN S L ET AL, "Enhanced humoral and Type 1 cellular immune responses with Fluzone<(>R) adjuvanted with a synthetic TLR4 agonist formulated in an emulsion", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, vol. 27, no. 43, doi:10.1016/J.VACCINE.2009.07.081, ISSN 0264-410X, (20091009), pages 5956 - 5963, (20090811), XP026643892 [A] 2,3,6-13 * paragraph [02.3] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2009.07.081
 [Y]  - OTT G ET AL, "MF59. DESIGN AND EVALUATION OF A SAFE AND POTENT ADJUVANT FOR HUMAN VACCINES", PHARMACEUTICAL BIOTECHNOLOGY, KLUWER, DORDRECHT, NL, (19950101), vol. 6, ISSN 1078-0467, pages 277 - 296, XP001206665 [Y] 4,5,14 * page 191 *
 [Y]  - KONG L ET AL, "Expression-System-Dependent Modulation of HIV-1 Envelope Glycoprotein Antigenicity and Immunogenicity", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, UNITED KINGDOM, vol. 403, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JMB.2010.08.033, ISSN 0022-2836, (20101015), pages 131 - 147, (20100825), XP027363319 [Y] 11,12 * figure 7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2010.08.033
 [T]  - M. A. MOODY ET AL, "Toll-Like Receptor 7/8 (TLR7/8) and TLR9 Agonists Cooperate To Enhance HIV-1 Envelope Antibody Responses in Rhesus Macaques", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY., US, (20140315), vol. 88, no. 6, doi:10.1128/JVI.03309-13, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 3329 - 3339, XP055226269 [T] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.03309-13
International search[X]WO2011106100  (DUKE UNIVERSITY);
 [A]US2012039916  (ZURAWSKI, G. ET AL.);
 [A]US2010047331  (HAYNES, B. F. ET AL.)
 [Y]  - KONG, L. ET AL., "Expression-System-Dependent Modulation of HIV-1 Envelope Glycoprotein Antigenicity and Immunogenicity", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (2010), vol. 403, pages 131 - 147, XP027363319

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2010.08.033
 [A]  - WILLE-REECE, U. ET AL., "Immunization with HIV-1 Gag Protein Conjugated to a TLR7/8 Agonist Results in the Generation of HIV-1 Gag-Specific Th1 and CD8+ T Cell Responses", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 174, no. 12, pages 7676 - 7683, XP002545301
 [A]  - KORNBLUTH, R. S. ET AL., "Immunostimulatory Combinations: Designing the Next Generation of Vaccine Adjuvants", JOURNAL OF LEUKOCYTE BIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 80, pages 1084 - 1102, XP002584239
by applicantUS5709879
 US6451352
    - BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 6, pages 141 - 228
    - KWISSA ET AL., BLOOD, (2012), vol. 119, pages 2044 - 55
    - POCKROS ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2003), vol. 124, page A766
    - POCKROS ET AL., J. HEPATOL., (2007), vol. 47, no. 2, pages 174 - 182
    - VACARI ET AL., ANTIVIRAL THERAPY, (2007), vol. 12, pages 741 - 751