Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2823501

EP2823501 - PLURIDIRECTIONAL VERY HIGH ELECTRON ENERGY RADIATION THERAPY SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/03]PLURIDIRECTIONAL VERY HIGH ELECTRON ENERGY RADIATION THERAPY SYSTEMS AND PROCESSES
[2018/43]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.02.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University
Office of the General Counsel
Building 170, Third Floor, Main Quad
P.O. Box 20386
Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US
[2019/38]
Former [2019/18]For all designated states
The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University
Office of Technology Licensing
1705 El Camino Real
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
Former [2015/03]For all designated states
The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University
Office of Technology Licensing 1705 El Camino Real
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LOO, Billy Wiseman
649 Pilgrim Drive
Foster City, California 94404 / US
02 / MAXIM, Peter G.
2050 Emerson Street
Palo Alto, California 94301 / US
03 / DOLGASHEV, Valery A.
3362 Brittan Avenue No.2
San Carlos, California 94070 / US
 [2019/18]
Former [2015/03]01 / LOO, Billy Wiseman
649 Pilgrim Drive
Foster City, California 94404 / US
02 / MAXIM, Peter G.
2050 Emerson Street
Palo Alto, California 94301 / US
03 / DOLGASHEV, Valery A.
3362 Brittan Avenue 2
San Carlos, California 94070 / US
Representative(s)Clark, Jane Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2015/03]
Application number, filing date13757604.712.02.2013
[2019/18]
WO2013US25765
Priority number, dateUS201261606408P03.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261606408 P
[2015/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013133936
Date:12.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2823501
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013
[2015/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2823501
Date:01.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01J3/32, A61N5/10, A61B6/00, G21K1/08
[2015/43]
Former International [2015/03]H01J3/32
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PLURIDIREKTIONALE STRAHLENTHERAPIEVORRICHTUNGEN MIT SEHR HOHER ELEKTRONENENERGIE[2018/43]
English:PLURIDIRECTIONAL VERY HIGH ELECTRON ENERGY RADIATION THERAPY SYSTEMS[2018/43]
French:SYSTÈMES DE RADIOTHÉRAPIE PLURIDIRECTIONNELLE À TRÈS HAUTE ÉNERGIE D'ÉLECTRONS[2018/43]
Former [2015/03]PLURIDIREKTIONALE STRAHLENTHERAPIEVORRICHTUNGEN MIT SEHR HOHER ELEKTRONENENERGIE UND VERFAHREN
Former [2015/03]PLURIDIRECTIONAL VERY HIGH ELECTRON ENERGY RADIATION THERAPY SYSTEMS AND PROCESSES
Former [2015/03]SYSTÈMES ET PROCESSUS DE RADIOTHÉRAPIE PLURIDIRECTIONNELLE À TRÈS HAUTE ÉNERGIE D'ÉLECTRONS
Entry into regional phase30.09.2014National basic fee paid 
30.09.2014Search fee paid 
30.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/03]
18.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2018Date of oral proceedings
12.10.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
17.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
21.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2019Fee for grant paid
21.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
26.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL01.05.2019
ES01.05.2019
FI01.05.2019
HR01.05.2019
LT01.05.2019
LV01.05.2019
RS01.05.2019
BG01.08.2019
NO01.08.2019
GR02.08.2019
IS01.09.2019
PT01.09.2019
[2020/04]
Former [2019/51]AL01.05.2019
ES01.05.2019
FI01.05.2019
HR01.05.2019
LT01.05.2019
LV01.05.2019
RS01.05.2019
BG01.08.2019
NO01.08.2019
GR02.08.2019
PT01.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL01.05.2019
ES01.05.2019
FI01.05.2019
HR01.05.2019
LT01.05.2019
LV01.05.2019
RS01.05.2019
NO01.08.2019
GR02.08.2019
PT01.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES01.05.2019
FI01.05.2019
LT01.05.2019
NO01.08.2019
PT01.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES01.05.2019
FI01.05.2019
LT01.05.2019
NO01.08.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]US2008298401  (FAURE JEROME [FR] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0013] *;
 [X]US4726046  (NUNAN CRAIG S [US]) [X] 1-15 * column 3, line 40 - line 47 * * column 8, line 1 - line 15 * * column 9, line 23 - line 52 * * column 10, line 54 - column 15, line 35 *;
 [X]US2004079899  (MA LIJUN [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0014]; figure 1; claim 19 * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0052] *;
 [X]US7835492  (SAHADEVAN VELAYUDHAN [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9-13 * column 12, line 28 - line 30 * * column 18, line 22 - line 43 * * column 19, line 3 - line 5 * * column 24, line 55 - line 65 * * column 26, line 17 - line 19 * * column 30, line 39 - line 55; claim 1 *
 [XA]  - A. BRAHME ET AL, "Electron and Photon Beams from a 50 MeV Racetrack Microtron", ACTA ONCOLOGICA, (19800101), vol. 19, no. 4, doi:10.3109/02841868009130169, ISSN 0284-186X, pages 305 - 319, XP055211883 [X] 1,5,9,10 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,6-8,11-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/02841868009130169
International search[Y]US2010246767  (TANABE EIJI [JP]);
 [Y]US8039819  (FAURE JEROME [FR], et al);
 [Y]US2009212231  (HILL PATRICK M [US], et al);
 [Y]US2011093243  (TAWHAI MERRYN H [NZ], et al);
 [Y]US5684854  (HUGHES JOHN H [US]);
 [Y]US6977987  (YAMASHITA ICHIRO [JP], et al)
ExaminationUS2010207042
    - FURUKAWA TAKUJI ET AL, "Design study of a raster scanning system for moving target irradiation in heavy-ion radiotherapy", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20070227), vol. 34, no. 3, doi:10.1118/1.2558213, ISSN 0094-2405, pages 1085 - 1097, XP012103329

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.2558213
by applicantUS2008298401
 US4726046
 US2004079899
 US7835492
    - A BRAHME ET AL., "Electron and Photon Beams from a 50 MeV Racetrack Microtron", ACTA ONCOLOGY, (19800101), vol. 19, no. 4