Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2823425

EP2823425 - COMPUTER-BASED METHOD FOR 3D SIMULATION OF OIL AND GAS OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.10.2016
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.11.2016  [2016/46]
Applicant(s)For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Schlumberger Technology B.V.
Parkstraat 83-89m
2514 JG The Hague / NL
For:GB  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71
Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG
[N/P]
Former [2015/03]For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Schlumberger Technology B.V.
Parkstraat 83-89m
2514 JG The Hague / NL
For:GB  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71
Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town
Tortola 1110 / VG
Inventor(s)01 / LOTH, Matthew
Schlumberger
Level 13
179 North Quay
Brisbane, Queensland 4000 / AU
02 / ROBINEAU, Delphine
228 Rue Einstein, 77000
Vaux le Penil / FR
03 / ZUBAIR, Khalid
Building 7, 1 Rue Henri Becquerel
Clamart
92142 Paris / FR
 [2015/03]
Representative(s)Ford, Michael Frederick
Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited
High Cross
Madingley Road
Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB
[2015/03]
Application number, filing date13758075.906.03.2013
WO2013US29261
Priority number, dateEP2012015868708.03.2012         Original published format: EP 12158687
[2015/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013134338
Date:12.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2823425
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013
[2015/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR12.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00, G06T17/00
[2015/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/03]
TitleGerman:COMPUTERBASIERTES VERFAHREN ZUR 3- SIMULATION VON ÖL- UND GASOPERATIONEN[2015/03]
English:COMPUTER-BASED METHOD FOR 3D SIMULATION OF OIL AND GAS OPERATIONS[2015/03]
French:PROCÉDÉ INFORMATIQUE POUR UNE SIMULATION 3D D'OPÉRATIONS PÉTROLIÈRES ET GAZIÈRES[2015/03]
Entry into regional phase05.09.2014National basic fee paid 
05.09.2014Search fee paid 
05.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/03]
12.06.2015Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
13.09.2015Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
01.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/46]
11.07.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/46]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.02.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201604   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]US2007238085  (COLVIN RICHARD T [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0037] - [0184] *;
 [I]US2009319058  (ROVAGLIO MAURIZIO [IT] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0032] - [0138] *
 [I]  - Keping Zhou ET AL, "Virtual Reality Simulation System for Underground Mining Project", Virtual Reality, InTech, (20110108), doi:10.5772/12903, ISBN 978-953-30-7518-1, XP055237986 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.5772/12903
 [I]  - XIANMEI LIU ET AL, "An interactive virtual environment inhabited virtual agents for oil-field safety operation training", AUDIO, LANGUAGE AND IMAGE PROCESSING, 2008. ICALIP 2008. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080707), ISBN 978-1-4244-1723-0, pages 1400 - 1406, XP031298569 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [I]  - GUO MINGMING ET AL, "Virtual reality simulation system for underground mining process", COMPUTER SCIENCE&EDUCATION, 2009. ICCSE '09. 4TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090725), ISBN 978-1-4244-3520-3, pages 1013 - 1017, XP031523695 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [I]  - HE ZHIMIN ET AL, "Research of top drive drilling equipments simulation", COMPUTER SCIENCE AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY (ICCSIT), 2010 3RD IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100709), ISBN 978-1-4244-5537-9, pages 415 - 419, XP031748255 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [I]  - IGOR SARAIVA BRASIL ET AL, "An intelligent and persistent browser-based game for oil drilling operators training", SERIOUS GAMES AND APPLICATIONS FOR HEALTH (SEGAH), 2011 IEEE 1ST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20111116), doi:10.1109/SEGAH.2011.6165431, ISBN 978-1-4673-0433-7, pages 1 - 9, XP032127584 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SeGAH.2011.6165431
 [I]  - Vineet R Kamat ET AL, "AUTOMATED GENERATION OF DYNAMIC, OPERATIONS LEVEL VIRTUAL CONSTRUCTION SCENARIOS6 EDITOR: Kalle Kahkonen", (20030501), URL: http://www.itcon.org/data/works/att/2003_6.content.08612.pdf, (20151222), XP055237963 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US2007238085  (RICHARD THURSTON COLVIN ET AL.);
 [Y]  - HE ZHIMIN ET AL., "Research of Top Drive Drilling Equipments Simulation", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER SCIENCE AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY (ICCSIT), (20100709), pages 415 - 419, XP031748255
 [A]  - ZHENPEI LI ET AL., "Application of ArcGIS Pipeline Data Model and GIS in Digital Oil and Gas Pipeline", 18TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON GEOINFORMATICS, (20100618), pages 1 - 5, XP031750225
 [A]  - HONGJUN ZHU ET AL., "Simulations of asphalt-base crude oil flow in vertical riser", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ADVANCED COMPUTER THEORY AND ENGINEERING (ICACTE), (20100820), pages V6.112 - V6.116, XP031758875
 [A]  - IGOR SARAIVA BRASIL ET AL., "An Intelligent and Persistent Browser-Based Game for Oil Drilling Operators Training", IEEE 1ST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SERIOUS GAMES AND APPLICATIONS FOR HEALTH (SEGAH), (20111116), pages 1 - 9, XP032127584

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SeGAH.2011.6165431