Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2824916

EP2824916 - DISPLAY SYSTEM, DISPLAY DEVICE, DISPLAY METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.09.2016
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.10.2016  [2016/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[2015/32]
Former [2015/03]For all designated states
NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd.
1753 Shimonumabe
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8666 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YOSHIOKA, Kenji
c/o NEC CASIO Mobile Communications Ltd.
1753, Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8666 / JP
02 / TANAI, Sumio
1-9-2, Warunouchi, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
 [2015/15]
Former [2015/03]01 / YOSHIOKA, Kenji
NEC CASIO, Mobile communications Ltd.
1753
Shimonumabe, Nakahare-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118666 / JP
02 / TANAI, Sumio
1-9-2, Warunouchi, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/03]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13758375.319.02.2013
WO2013JP54022
Priority number, dateJP2012005223708.03.2012         Original published format: JP 2012052237
[2015/03]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013133010
Date:12.09.2013
Language:JA
[2013/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2824916
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP12.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/173, H04N21/442, H04N21/472, H04N21/482
[2015/43]
Former International [2015/03]H04N7/173
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/03]
TitleGerman:ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG, ANZEIGESYSTEM, ANZEIGEVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM[2015/03]
English:DISPLAY SYSTEM, DISPLAY DEVICE, DISPLAY METHOD, AND PROGRAM[2015/03]
French:SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE, DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE, PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE ET PROGRAMME[2015/03]
Entry into regional phase04.08.2014Translation filed 
03.09.2014National basic fee paid 
03.09.2014Search fee paid 
03.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/03]
19.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/43]
27.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XP]EP2501144  (ZEEBOX LTD [GB]) [XP] 1,8-10 * figure 12 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0033] *;
 [XYI]US2012054795  (KANG SANG-WOOK [KR] ET AL) [X] 1,2,8-10 * figure 12 * * paragraphs [0030] , [0074] - [0081] * [Y] 3-5 [I] 6,7;
 [Y]US2007266401  (HALLBERG BRYAN S [US]) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0002] , [0054] , [0055] , [0076] , [0084] *;
 [Y]JP2003153105  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [Y] 4,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] *;
 [A]US2002133506  (YAMATO JUN-ICHI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2005347806  (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]US2011288912  (MCCREA JOHN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
International search[X]JP2011234198  (SONY CORP.);
 [A]JP2012009957  (SHARP CORP.);
 [A]JP2009212630  (ANODOS INC.);
 [A]JP2011040858  (SHARP CORP.)
by applicantJP2003199084
 JP2007166363
 JP2010109792