EP2800343 - MESSAGE PROCESSING METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Device Co., Ltd. B2-5 of Nanfang Factory No.2 of Xincheng Road Songshan Lake Science and Technology Industrial Zone Dongguan, Guangdong 523808 / CN | [2019/03] |
Former [2019/02] | For all designated states Huawei Device (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd. Building B2, Huawei Industrial Base, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
Former [2014/45] | For all designated states Huawei Device Co., Ltd. Building B2 Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAI, Chunrong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13758529.5 | 06.03.2013 | WO2013CN72208 | Priority number, date | CN20121058052 | 07.03.2012 Original published format: CN201210058052 | [2014/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013131472 | Date: | 12.09.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2800343 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/12 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
H04L61/59 (EP,US);
H04L61/4511 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR NACHRICHTENVERARBEITUNG | [2014/45] | English: | MESSAGE PROCESSING METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM | [2014/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE MESSAGES | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2014 | Translation filed | 30.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 26.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.05.2019 | 09.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/41] | 31.05.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7734683 (BERGENWALL MARTIN [FI], et al) [A] 1-15* column 1, line 19 - column 3, line 34 *; | [X] - DEB S ET AL, "An improved DNS server selection algorithm for faster lookups", COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS SOFTWARE AND MIDDLEWARE AND WORKSHOPS, 2008. COMSWARE 2008. 3RD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080106), ISBN 978-1-4244-1796-4, pages 288 - 295, XP031279692 [X] 1-15 * Chapters I-III * | International search | [X]US2006039352 (KARSTENS CHRISTOPHER K [US]); | [A]CN101631133 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [X]CN101841577 (ZTE CORP); | [XP]CN102572014 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD) |