Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2866638

EP2866638 - ENHANCED VISUALIZATION OF BLOOD VESSELS USING A ROBOTICALLY STEERED ENDOSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2019/49]
Former [2015/19]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / POPOVIC, Aleksandra
c/o High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / ELHAWARY, Haytham
c/o High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2019/29]
Former [2015/19]01 / POPOVIC, Aleksandra
c/o High Tech Campus 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / ELHAWARY, Haytham
c/o High Tech Campus 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Representative(s)Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2019/49]
Former [2015/19]Steffen, Thomas
Philips International B.V.
Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date13759813.220.06.2013
[2019/49]
WO2013IB55070
Priority number, dateUS201261665375P28.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261665375 P
[2015/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014001980
Date:03.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2866638
Date:06.05.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014
[2015/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2866638
Date:04.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B1/00, A61B1/313
[2015/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE VISUALISIERUNG VON BLUTGEFÄSSEN MITTELS EINES ROBOTISCH GESTEUERTEN ENDOSKOPS[2015/19]
English:ENHANCED VISUALIZATION OF BLOOD VESSELS USING A ROBOTICALLY STEERED ENDOSCOPE[2015/19]
French:VISUALISATION AMÉLIORÉE DE VAISSEAUX SANGUINS À L'AIDE D'UN ENDOSCOPE DIRIGÉ PAR ROBOTIQUE[2015/19]
Entry into regional phase28.01.2015National basic fee paid 
28.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
28.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/19]
03.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.05.2019
28.05.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
24.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.2019Fee for grant paid
21.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
06.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
02.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
01.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201604   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2012001549  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1 - page 8 *;
 [A]US2009005640  (FEHRE JENS [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0027] *;
 [A]US2004210105  (HALE ERIC LAWRENCE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraphs [0025] - [0038] *;
 [A]US2007060792  (DRAXINGER WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0054] - [0077] *;
 [A]WO2012035492  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 30 - page 6, line 22 *