Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810170

EP2810170 - RUN-TIME INSTRUMENTATION INDIRECT SAMPLING BY ADDRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 31.10.2018  [2018/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, New York 10504 / US
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / GAINEY, Charles W.
IBM Corporation
2455 South Road
Poughkeepsie, New York 12601 / US
02 / GSCHWIND, Michael
IBM Corporation
2455 South Road
Poughkeepsie, New York 12601 / US
03 / BRADBURY, Jonathan D.
IBM Corporation
2455 South Road
Poughkeepsie, New York 12601 / US
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Graham, Timothy Abbey
IBM United Kingdom Limited
Intellectual Property Law
Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[2014/50]
Application number, filing date13760760.222.02.2013
[2017/14]
WO2013JP01016
Priority number, dateUS20121342255016.03.2012         Original published format: US201213422550
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013136681
Date:19.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810170
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2810170
Date:05.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP19.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/34, G06F11/36, G06F9/30
[2015/18]
Former International [2014/50]G06F11/34
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:INDIREKTE LAUFZEITINSTRUMENTIERUNGSABTASTUNG NACH ADRESSEN[2014/50]
English:RUN-TIME INSTRUMENTATION INDIRECT SAMPLING BY ADDRESS[2014/50]
French:ÉCHANTILLONNAGE INDIRECT D'INSTRUMENTATION DU TEMPS D'EXÉCUTION PAR ADRESSE[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase04.09.2014National basic fee paid 
04.09.2014Search fee paid 
04.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
24.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2017Fee for grant paid
24.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.05.2016
Opposition(s)08.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
15.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
[2018/44]
Former [2018/25]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL05.04.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]US2006236067  (ATTINELLA JOHN M [US] ET AL ATTINELLA JOHN MICHAEL [US] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0058] *;
 [A]US2005198466  (ESTLICK MICHAEL D [US] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0061] *;
 [A]WO2007145903  (ACUMEM AB [SE]; BERG ERIK [SE]; VESTERLUND MAGNUS [SE]; ZEFFER HAKAN [) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 22, line 5 - page 24, line 5 *;
 [A]US5608866  (HORIKAWA TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 9, line 23 - column 12, line 28 *
International search[A]US2003005423  (CHEN DONG-YUAN);
 [A]US2011173588  (SALAPURA VALENTINA);
 [A]US2004019886  (BERENT ANTHONY NEIL);
 [A]US2010077143  (REID ALASTAIR DAVID);
 [A]US2008222382  (SNYDER MICHAEL D.)
by applicantUS2004019886
 US2006236067
 US2005198466
 WO2007145903
 US5608866