Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2810170 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2810170



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 466
09.02.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
06.04.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
09.03.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.02.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.02.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 8
24.02.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 7
24.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.01.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
18.01.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
18.01.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
18.01.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 71
18.01.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 71
01.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
01.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
01.09.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
01.09.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
01.09.2016 Description Search / examination 3
01.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.09.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.05.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
09.05.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.04.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
24.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.09.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
24.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
24.09.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
24.09.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
24.09.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
24.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.04.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
30.03.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.03.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 5
30.03.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
27.02.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.10.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
22.09.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
22.09.2014 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
16.09.2014 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
04.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.09.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
04.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
04.09.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 51
04.09.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
04.09.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
04.09.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
23.07.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
09.10.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 87
19.09.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
19.09.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 61