Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2810170


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.10.2018  [2018/44]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
09.02.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
03.03.2017 (Expected) grant published on  05.04.2017  [2017/14]
28.02.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
28.02.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
25.02.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
18.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.01.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.09.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
18.05.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.05.2016 First examination report
17.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.09.2015 Amendment by applicant
22.05.2015 Change - extension states published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
27.03.2015 Change - classification published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
27.03.2015 Change - classification published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
27.03.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
21.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
07.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
10.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.09.2014 Amendment by applicant
02.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
20.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication