Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2836270

EP2836270 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS RELATED TO THE TREATMENT OF BACK PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SPR Therapeutics, Inc.
22901 Millcreek Boulevard, Suite 110
Cleveland, OH 44122 / US
[2018/01]
Former [2015/08]For all designated states
SPR Therapeutics, LLC
22901 Millcreek Boulevard, Suite 110
Cleveland, OH 44122 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WONGSARNPIGOON, Amorn
305 Glade Street
Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US
02 / BENNETT, Maria
25335 Letchwood Road
Beachwood, OH 44122 / US
03 / BOGGS, Joseph
215 Glade Street
Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US
04 / CHAE, John
18213 Heritage Trail
Strongsville, OH 44136 / US
05 / SAULINO, Michael, F.
1201 Ellston Road
Havertown, PA 19083 / US
 [2015/08]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/08]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
Alpha Tower
Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Application number, filing date13760774.315.03.2013
WO2013US32627
Priority number, dateUS201261611560P15.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261611560 P
[2015/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013138786
Date:19.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2836270
Date:18.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013
[2015/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/34
[2015/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/08]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT DER BEHANDLUNG VON RÜCKENSCHMERZEN[2015/08]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS RELATED TO THE TREATMENT OF BACK PAIN[2015/08]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS LIÉS AU TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR DORSALE[2015/08]
Entry into regional phase16.09.2014National basic fee paid 
16.09.2014Search fee paid 
16.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/08]
29.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.08.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201503   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2015
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2011224665  (CROSBY PETER ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 40] - [0092]; figures 1, 2 * [I] 3,5;
 [X]US2012016439  (ALATARIS KONSTANTINOS [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0022] - [0037]; figures 1A, 1B *;
 [XA]US2008228241  (SACHS DAN [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0031] - [0041]; figures 1A, 1B, 1C, 2, 4 * [A] 2-15
International search[X]US2011224665  (CROSBY PETER ANDREW [US], et al);
 [Y]US2008228241  (SACHS DAN [US]);
 [Y]US2005240243  (BAROLAT GIANCARLO [US], et al);
 [Y]US2007027501  (JENSEN STEVEN L [US], et al)