Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2895408

EP2895408 - APPARATUS FOR ASSISTING THE MOVEMENT OF A CHAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rexnord Flattop Europe S.r.l.
Via Dell'Industria 4
42015 Correggio (RE) / IT
[2015/30]
Inventor(s)01 / ANDREOLI, Andrea
via Quattro Ville 251/1
I-41123 Modena (MO) / IT
 [2015/30]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2016/47]
Former [2015/30]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13762128.013.09.2013
[2016/47]
WO2013EP69041
Priority number, dateIT2012MI0151514.09.2012         Original published format: IT MI20121515
[2015/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014041133
Date:20.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2895408
Date:22.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2014
[2015/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2895408
Date:23.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:B65G21/20
[2015/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER BEWEGUNG EINER KETTE[2015/30]
English:APPARATUS FOR ASSISTING THE MOVEMENT OF A CHAIN[2015/30]
French:APPAREIL D'ASSISTANCE DU MOUVEMENT D'UNE CHAÎNE[2015/30]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2015National basic fee paid 
31.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/30]
10.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.06.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
30.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.2016Fee for grant paid
14.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.02.2016
Opposition(s)24.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.09.2013
AT23.11.2016
CY23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
MC23.11.2016
MK23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SI23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
BG23.02.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU13.09.2013
AT23.11.2016
CY23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
MC23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SI23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
BG23.02.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2019/31]HU13.09.2013
AT23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
MC23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SI23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
BG23.02.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2018/29]AT23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
MC23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SI23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
BG23.02.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/52]AT23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SI23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
BG23.02.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/38]AT23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
BG23.02.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/37]AT23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/36]AT23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/34]AT23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV23.11.2016
Cited inInternational search[YD]US2010294626  (MULLER ERWIN [CH]) [YD] 1-7,13 * page 3, paragraph 56 - page 4, paragraph 59 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]GB2127372  (GEWERK EISENHUETTE WESTFALIA) [Y] 1-7,13 * page 2, line 49 - page 3, line 80 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE301823  (BUHL PAUL) [A] 1-4,13 * page 1, line 48 - line 72 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE3149555  (GEWERK EISENHUETTE WESTFALIA [DE]) [A] 1-5,7-9 * page 7, line 9 - page 8, line 10 * * figures 1-4 *
by applicantUS2010294626