Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2890432

EP2890432 - VARIABLE RATE CONTROLLED DELIVERY DRIVE MECHANISMS FOR DRUG DELIVERY PUMPS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.05.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unitract Syringe Pty Ltd
Suite 3, Level 11 1 Chifley Square
Sydney, NSW 2000 / AU
[2015/28]
Inventor(s)01 / BENTE IV, Paul F.
87 Bunker Hill Court
Wayne, Pennsylvania 19087 / US
02 / HANSON, Ian B.
690 Davis Lane
Wayne, Pennsylvania 19087 / US
03 / MANDES, Vincent E.
30 Knock N Knoll Circle
Willow Grove, Pennsylvania 19090 / US
04 / O'CONNOR, Sean M.
201 Ford Circle
West Chester, Pennsylvania 19380 / US
 [2015/28]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
5th Floor, Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/23]Marks & Clerk (Luxembourg) LLP
44, rue de la Vallée
2661 Luxembourg / LU
Former [2015/28]Watterson, Peer Marten John
Marks & Clerk (Luxembourg)
B.P. 1775
1017 Luxembourg / LU
Application number, filing date13762339.329.08.2013
[2017/23]
WO2013US57327
Priority number, dateUS201261694534P29.08.2012         Original published format: US 201261694534 P
US201261731744P30.11.2012         Original published format: US 201261731744 P
US201361748667P03.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361748667 P
[2015/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2014036285
Date:06.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/10]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2890432
Date:08.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2014
[2015/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2890432
Date:07.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/145
[2015/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANTRIEBSMECHANISMEN FÜR ARZNEIMITTELABGABEPUMPEN MIT GESTEUERTER FREISETZUNG UND VARIABLER RATE[2015/28]
English:VARIABLE RATE CONTROLLED DELIVERY DRIVE MECHANISMS FOR DRUG DELIVERY PUMPS[2015/28]
French:MÉCANISMES D'ENTRAÎNEMENT D'ADMINISTRATION COMMANDÉE À VITESSE VARIABLE POUR POMPES D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT[2015/28]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2015National basic fee paid 
27.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/28]
18.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
24.03.2017Fee for grant paid
24.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.05.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
02.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17163810.9  / EP3210636
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.11.2016
Opposition(s)08.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.08.2013
CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
MT29.08.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
MT29.08.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/25]CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/11]CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/10]CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
Former [2017/50]HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
Former [2017/49]HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
NO07.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2166497  (INFORS GMBH) [X] 15-37 * page 1, line 94 - page 2, line 26 *;
 [X]WO2008142394  (DANBY SCIENT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 15-37 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2010112377  (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al) [X] 15-37 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4921487  (BUFFET JACQUES [FR], et al) [A] 1-37 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9920327  (I FLOW CORP [US]) [A] 1-37 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2452286  (CILAG GMBH INT [CH]) [A] 1-37 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007128767  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-37 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2012US54861
 WO2013US30478
 WO2012US53174