Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2863979

EP2863979 - REVERSIBLE FRAME FOR A PATIENT INTERFACE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/18]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / FRANZEN, Erika
c/o High Tech Campus 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2015/18]
Representative(s)Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/18]Steffen, Thomas
Philips International B.V.
Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date13762555.419.06.2013
WO2013IB55025
Priority number, dateUS201261661839P20.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261661839 P
[2015/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013190480
Date:27.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2863979
Date:29.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013
[2015/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/06
[2015/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/18]
TitleGerman:UMKEHRBARER RAHMEN FÜR EINE PATIENTENSCHNITTSTELLENANORDNUNG[2015/18]
English:REVERSIBLE FRAME FOR A PATIENT INTERFACE ASSEMBLY[2015/18]
French:CADRE RÉVERSIBLE POUR UN ENSEMBLE INTERFACE DE PATIENT[2015/18]
Entry into regional phase20.01.2015National basic fee paid 
20.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
20.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/18]
21.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.04.2018
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
07.11.2018Request for further processing filed
07.11.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.11.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
06.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
02.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
01.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201604   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.2016
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2012028995  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; JABLONSKI GREGORY JOHN [US]) [X] 1-7,9-11,13,17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] - [0030] - [0 35] - [0045] * [I] 8,12,14-16,18,19;
 [XI]WO2009139647  (FISHER & PAYKEL HEALTHCARE LTD [NZ]; GRADON LEWIS GEORGE [NZ]; SALMON) [X] 1-3,9-11,17 * abstract * * page 6, lines 21-26 * * page 7, lines 24-34 * * page 9, lines 3-8 * [I] 12,18,19;
 [A]US2009145437  (HALPERN IAN [US]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * * figures 20c, 20d *;
 [A]US2009183739  (WONDKA ANTHONY D [US]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * * paragraph [0082] *;
 [A]WO2011121466  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; BUSCH LANCE RANARD [US]; HO PETER) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]WO2007048174  (RESMED LTD [AU]; NG EVA [AU]; HENRY ROBERT EDWARD [AU]; KWOK PHILIP RO) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1658873  (SCHUMACHER GERHARD [DE]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0205883  (AU CT ADVANCED MED TECHNOLOGY [AU]; SULLIVAN COLIN EDWARD [AU]; WILKIE) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2006174891  (AMMANN SHARI R [US]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * * paragraph [0031] *;
 [A]WO2009108995  (RESMED LTD [AU]; NG EVA [AU]; LOCKWOOD DAVID JAMES [AU]; WEHBEH JAMIE) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *