Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2893254

EP2893254 - LAMP WITH REMOTE LED LIGHT SOURCE AND HEAT DISSIPATING ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  11.09.2015
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 14.10.2015  [2015/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cree, Inc.
4600 Silicon Drive
Durham, NC 27703 / US
[2015/29]
Inventor(s)01 / PROGL, Curt
1933 Hilltop Road
Raleigh, NC 27610 / US
02 / ATHALYE, Praneet
104 Button Road
Morrisville, NC 27560 / US
03 / NEGLEY, Gerald
74 Bear Tree Creek
Chapel Hill, NC 27517 / US
 [2015/29]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2015/29]
Application number, filing date13762957.230.08.2013
WO2013US57712
Priority number, dateUS20121360730007.09.2012         Original published format: US201213607300
[2015/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014039405
Date:13.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2893254
Date:15.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2014
[2015/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:F21V29/00, F21K99/00, F21V3/00, F21V3/04, F21V29/02, F21Y101/02, F21Y111/00
[2015/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/29]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LAMPE MIT EINER ENTFERNTEN LED-LICHTQUELLE UND WÄRMEABSTRAHLUNGSELEMENTEN[2015/29]
English:LAMP WITH REMOTE LED LIGHT SOURCE AND HEAT DISSIPATING ELEMENTS[2015/29]
French:LAMPE À SOURCE DE LUMIÈRE À DEL DISTANTE ET ÉLÉMENTS DE DISSIPATION THERMIQUE[2015/29]
Entry into regional phase01.04.2015National basic fee paid 
01.04.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
01.04.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/29]
02.09.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/42]
Cited inInternational search[XAYI]US2011074296  (SHEN YU-NUNG [TW], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,11-16,22,25,26,28,32,33,41-44,47-50 * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0122] * * figures 13-16 * [A] 54 [Y] 10,16-20,27,29,34-38,51-53,60 [I] 39;
 [XI]US5890794  (ABTAHI HOMAYOON [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9,11-14,25,26 * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 14 * * column 7, line 13 - column 8, line 13 * * figures 5,7 * [I] 16,21-24,42-46;
 [XAYI]DE102011004718  (OSRAM AG [DE]) [X] 1-8,11,21,22,25,26,42,43,45,47 * the whole document * [A] 28,54 [Y] 34-37,55-60 [I] 9,12-15,46;
 [XA]FR2941346  (CASSIOPEE DECORATION [FR]) [X] 28,30,40,41 * the whole document * [A] 1,42,54;
 [XA]KR100944181B  (YONG NAM SOON [KR]) [X] 28,31,39-41 * the whole document * [A] 1,42;
 [XAY]KR20100037353  (AMOLUXE CO LTD [KR]) [X] 28,54 * the whole document * [A] 1,42 [Y] 20,53,55-60;
 [XAI]EP1881259  (LIQUIDLEDS LIGHTING CO LTD [TW]) [X] 1-5,14,21-23,25,26,42-46 * paragraphs [0019] , [0 21] , [0 22] * * figure 13 * [A] 28,54 [I] 8,11,12;
 [YA]US2011176316  (PHIPPS J MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 10,27,38 * the whole document * [A] 1,28,42,54;
 [A]US2009175041  (YUEN PUI HANG [HK], et al) [A] 1,28,42,54 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2469154  (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY [JP], et al) [A] 1,28,42,54 * the whole document *;
 [YA]WO2011100193  (CREE INC [US], et al) [Y] 16-19,29,51,52 * the whole document * [A] 1,28,42,54
by applicantUS6350041
 US7213940
 US20070899790
 US20060473089
 US20100901405