Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2895619

EP2895619 - ANKRD26 AS A MARKER FOR DIAGNOSIS OF THROMBOCYTOPENIAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  09.09.2016
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 12.10.2016  [2016/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut Gustave Roussy (IGR)
39, rue Camille Desmoulins
94800 Villejuif / FR
[2015/30]
Inventor(s)01 / BLUTEAU, Dominique
24 Rue Coriolis
F-75012 Paris / FR
02 / FAVIER, Rémi
Immeuble B
13 Allée Trevise
F-92330 Sceaux / FR
03 / RASLOVA, Hana
23 Rue du Tertre
F-91830 Le Coudry Montceaux / FR
04 / VAINCHENKER, William
7 Rue Geoffroy St Hilaire
F-75005 Paris / FR
 [2015/30]
Representative(s)Barbot, Willy
Simodoro-ip
82, rue Sylvabelle
13006 Marseille / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/30]Barbot, Willy
SIMODORO-ip
1 place des Prêcheurs
13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR
Application number, filing date13763192.517.09.2013
WO2013EP02799
Priority number, dateEP2012000652917.09.2012         Original published format: EP 12006529
[2015/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014040755
Date:20.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2895619
Date:22.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2014
[2015/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2015/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/30]
TitleGerman:ANKRD26 ALS MARKER ZUR DIAGNOSE VON THROMBOZYTOPENIEN[2015/30]
English:ANKRD26 AS A MARKER FOR DIAGNOSIS OF THROMBOCYTOPENIAS[2015/30]
French:ANKRD26 EN TANT QUE MARQUEUR POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC DE THROMBOCYTOPÉNIES[2015/30]
Entry into regional phase17.04.2015National basic fee paid 
17.04.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
17.04.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/30]
02.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.09.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2012113555  (INST GUSTAVE ROUSSY IGR [FR], et al) [Y] 5,11,12 * paragraphs [0132] - [0135]; claim 8 *
 [XI]  - H. RASLOVA ET AL, "Interrelation between polyploidization and megakaryocyte differentiation: a gene profiling approach", BLOOD, (20070415), vol. 109, no. 8, doi:10.1182/blood-2006-07-037838, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 3225 - 3234, XP055042616 [X] 9,11,13,14 * page 3226 * [I] 10,12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2006-07-037838
 [IY]  - A. C. GLEMBOTSKY ET AL, "International collaboration as a tool for diagnosis of patients with inherited thrombocytopenia in the setting of a developing country", JOURNAL OF THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, (20120801), vol. 10, no. 8, doi:10.1111/j.1538-7836.2012.04805.x, ISSN 1538-7933, pages 1653 - 1661, XP055042623 [I] 1-4,6-10,13-15 * page 1660 * [Y] 5,11,12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1538-7836.2012.04805.x
by applicantUS4683202
 US5854033
    - PIPPUCCI T., THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, (20110107), vol. 88, pages 115 - 120
    - NORRIS P ET AL., BLOOD, (20110616), vol. 117, no. 24
    - BLOOD, (1996), vol. 87, pages 5218 - 5224
    - SONG ET AL., NAT GENET, (1999), vol. 23, pages 166 - 175
    - MICHAUD ET AL., BLOOD, (2002), vol. 99, pages 1364 - 1372
    - NIUL ET AL., COMPARATIVE HAEMATOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, (1992), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 106 - 110
    - GNATENKO ET AL., METHODS MOL. BIOL., (2009), vol. 496, pages 245 - 72
    - SCHEDEL; ROLF, METHODS MOL. BIOL., (2009), vol. 496, pages 273 - 83
    - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497
    - KOZBOR ET AL., IMMUNOL., (1983), vol. 4, page 72
    - COLE ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and Cancer Therapy, ALAN R. LISS,INC., (1985), pages 77 - 96
    - BARANY, PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 189 - 193
    - GUATELLI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 1874 - 1878
    - KWOH ET AL., PROC. NAIL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 1173 - 1177
    - LIZARDI ET AL., BIOL. TECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, page 1197