Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2828882

EP2828882 - METHOD, COMPUTER SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR RECIPE GENERATION FOR AUTOMATED INSPECTION SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.05.2019
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.05.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kla-Tencor Corporation
One Technology Drive
Milpitas, California 95035 / US
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / DE WEL, Koen
Boslaan 11
B-3050 Oud-Heverlee / BE
02 / CARETTE, Cedric
Polderstraat 41
B-2491 Balen-Olmen / BE
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Keane, Paul Fachtna
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin 4 / IE
Application number, filing date13763621.313.03.2013
WO2013IB51964
Priority number, dateUS201261612507P19.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261612507 P
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013140302
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2828882
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR26.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/00, H01L21/66, G01N21/95, G01N21/956, G03F7/20, G05B23/02, G05B19/418
[2016/14]
Former International [2015/05]H01L21/00, H01L21/66
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, COMPUTERSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REZEPTERSTELLJUNG FÜR EINE AUTOMATISIERTEN INSPEKTION VON HALBLEITERVORRICHTUNGEN[2015/05]
English:METHOD, COMPUTER SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR RECIPE GENERATION FOR AUTOMATED INSPECTION SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES[2015/05]
French:PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME INFORMATIQUE ET APPAREIL DE GÉNÉRATION DE RECETTES POUR LE CONTRÔLE AUTOMATISÉ DE DISPOSITIFS À SEMICONDUCTEURS[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase20.10.2014National basic fee paid 
20.10.2014Search fee paid 
20.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
05.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.05.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2010194422  (ITO NORIYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [Y] 4-7,9-15 [I] 8;
 [Y]US2007047800  (HIROI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 4,5,9-15 * abstract *;
 [Y]US2007053581  (UENO TAKETO [JP], et al) [Y] 6,7 * abstract *;
 [A]US2005043903  (NARA YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2009228217  (FUKUSHIMA TETSUYA [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2005075841  (PELES NETANEL [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2009088997  (KIKUCHI MASAAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
International search[Y]US2006265145  (HUET PATRICK [US], et al);
 [Y]US2010194422  (ITO NORIYUKI [JP]);
 [A]US2008162065  (TAKEDA MASAYOSHI [JP], et al);
 [A]JP2011017609  (PANASONIC CORP);
 [A]US2005119844  (LEE CHANG-HOON [KR], et al)
by applicantKR20010037026
 US6959251
 WO2009148876
 US2009290782