Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2829185

EP2829185 - LOWER-BODY GARMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.01.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.03.2016  [2016/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wacoal Corp.
29 Nakajima-cho Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 601-8530 / JP
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / YAMADA Takato
c/o WACOAL CORP.
29 Nakajima-cho
Kisshoin
Minami-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8530 / JP
02 / TANMATSU Yumiko
c/o WACOAL CORP.
29 Nakajima-cho
Kisshoin
Minami-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8530 / JP
03 / KITAGAWA Yuka
c/o WACOAL CORP.
29 Nakajima-cho
Kisshoin
Minami-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8530 / JP
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Fyfe, Fiona Allison Watson
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[2015/05]
Application number, filing date13763950.615.03.2013
WO2013JP57455
Priority number, dateJP2012006696223.03.2012         Original published format: JP 2012066962
[2015/05]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013141162
Date:26.09.2013
Language:JA
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2829185
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:A41D13/00, A41C1/00, A41C1/02
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
TitleGerman:UNTERKÖRPERKLEIDUNGSSTÜCK[2015/05]
English:LOWER-BODY GARMENT[2015/05]
French:VÊTEMENT POUR PARTIE INFÉRIEURE DU CORPS[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase11.09.2014Translation filed 
11.09.2014National basic fee paid 
11.09.2014Search fee paid 
11.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
01.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/09]
27.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/09]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]JP2007197877  (KABUSHIKI KAISHA QUATTRO-A);
 [Y]JP2005248389  (KANEBO, LTD.);
 [Y]JP2010275644  (YUGEN KAISHA DIGAMU);
 [Y]JP2011021291  (DESCENTE, LTD.)
by applicantJP2004044070