Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2830386

EP2830386 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CHANNEL ACCESS IN WIRELESS LAN SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yeouido-dong
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / CHOI, Jinsoo
LG Institute
533 Hogye 1(il)-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
02 / KIM, Jeongki
LG Institute
533 Hogye 1(il)-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
03 / SEOK, Yongho
LG Institute
533 Hogye 1(il)-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
04 / HAN, Seunghee
LG Institute
533 Hogye 1(il)-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
05 / KWAK, Jinsam
LG Institute
533 Hogye 1(il)-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2017/35]
Former [2015/05]Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date13764181.725.03.2013
[2017/35]
WO2013KR02445
Priority number, dateUS201261614515P23.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261614515 P
[2015/05]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013141669
Date:26.09.2013
Language:KO
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2830386
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2830386
Date:30.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR26.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W74/08, H04W74/00, // H04W84/12
[2017/10]
Former International [2015/43]H04W74/08, // H04W84/12, H04W74/00
Former International [2015/05]H04W74/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR KANALZUGRIFF IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN LAN-SYSTEM[2015/05]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CHANNEL ACCESS IN WIRELESS LAN SYSTEM[2015/05]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ACCÈS À UN CANAL DANS UN SYSTÈME LAN SANS FIL[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase25.09.2014Translation filed 
25.09.2014National basic fee paid 
25.09.2014Search fee paid 
25.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
04.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2017Fee for grant paid
12.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.02.2017
Opposition(s)31.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
GB25.03.2018
IE25.03.2018
LU25.03.2018
MT25.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
FR31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/23]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
GB25.03.2018
IE25.03.2018
LU25.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
FR31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
Former [2019/12]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
GB25.03.2018
IE25.03.2018
LU25.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
Former [2019/09]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
IE25.03.2018
LU25.03.2018
Former [2019/04]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
LU25.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/39]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/15]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[E]EP2836045  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [E] 1,13-15 * column 27, paragraph 148 - column 30, paragraph 172; figure 16 *;
 [A]US2004253996  (CHEN MENG-HONG [TW] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 8 * * page 3, paragraph 34 - page 5, paragraph 51 *;
 [A]WO2010095791  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]; SEOK YONG HO [KR]) [A] 1-15 * page 6, paragraph 56 - page 9, paragraph 82 *
 [A]  - TAKEUCHI S ET AL, "AN IMPROVED POWER SAVING MECHANISM FOR MAC PROTOCOL IN AD HOC NETWORKS", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (20050701), vol. E88-B, no. 7, doi:10.1093/IETCOM/E88-B.7.2985, ISSN 0916-8516, pages 2985 - 2993, XP001231881 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * IEEE802.11 PSM in DCF; page 2986, paragraph 2 * * New PSM (NPSM); page 2987, paragraph 3.2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/ietcom/e88-b.7.2985
International search[A]KR20040097596  (DAEWOO EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION);
 [A]US2009016306  (WANG, QI ET AL.);
 [A]US2008220770  (QI, EMILY H. ET AL.);
 [A]US2005124313  (SIMPSON, FLOYD D. ET AL.);
 [A]US2004186907  (WENTINK, MAARTEN MENZO)