Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2830145 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2830145



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 314
07.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
07.01.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
07.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
28.09.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
28.09.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
18.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
18.07.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
18.07.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
18.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.07.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
26.05.2017 Annex to a communication Search / examination 8
26.05.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.05.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.05.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
24.11.2016 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.11.2016 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Search / examination 1
18.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Deficiencies in an enquiry Search / examination 1
03.11.2016 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
02.09.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
02.09.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
14.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.09.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
14.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
14.09.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
14.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.03.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
02.03.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
20.02.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.02.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 6
20.02.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 3
13.02.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 31
04.02.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
08.01.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
24.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
07.10.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
30.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.05.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
29.11.2013 Information regarding early processing Search / examination 2
28.11.2013 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
14.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.11.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.11.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 29
14.11.2013 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 13
14.11.2013 Claims Search / examination 5
14.11.2013 Description Search / examination 29
14.11.2013 Drawings Search / examination 13
14.11.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
05.11.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 32
26.09.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
26.09.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 1
26.09.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 42