Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2830145


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
29.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.01.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.10.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.07.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.06.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.05.2017 First examination report
28.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.09.2015 Amendment by applicant
22.05.2015 Change - extension states published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
27.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.02.2015 Change - applicant published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
21.02.2015 Supplementary search report published on  25.03.2015  [2015/13]
20.02.2015 Change - classification published on  25.03.2015  [2015/13]
20.02.2015 Change - classification published on  25.03.2015  [2015/13]
26.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
26.12.2014 Request for examination filed published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
06.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.12.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
26.11.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
18.11.2013 Amendment by applicant
15.11.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
10.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
27.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication