Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2830145 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380001329 EP13764278



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9720478Global Dossier 01.08.2017B2
US2014089692 27.03.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2013JP01829 18.03.2013
JP2012062598 19.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JPWO2013140781Global Dossier 03.08.2015A1
Priority number Date
JP2013546477 18.03.2013
JP2012062598 19.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103548197BGlobal Dossier 20.04.2018B
CN103548197 29.01.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2013JP01829 18.03.2013
JP2012062598 19.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2830145Global Dossier 25.03.2015A4
EP2830145 28.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013JP01829 18.03.2013
JP2012062598 19.03.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013140781Global Dossier 26.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
JP2012062598 19.03.2012