Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2830145

EP2830145 - METHOD FOR MONITORING STORAGE CELL, SYSTEM FOR MONITORING STORAGE CELL, AND STORAGE CELL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
7 OBP Panasonic Tower
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2015/14]For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
7 OBP Panasonic Tower
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006 Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HANAFUSA, Hiroshi
c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property
Center Planning and Management Group
7F OBP Pansonic Tower
2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Vigand, Philippe , et al
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex - Genève / CH
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Vigand, Philippe , et al
Novagraaf International SA
3 chemin de l'Echo
1213 Onex Geneva / CH
Application number, filing date13764278.118.03.2013
WO2013JP01829
Priority number, dateJP2012006259819.03.2012         Original published format: JP 2012062598
[2015/05]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013140781
Date:26.09.2013
Language:JA
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2830145
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01M10/48, H02J13/00, G01R31/36, H02J7/04
[2015/13]
Former International [2015/05]H01M10/42, H01M10/44, H01M10/48, H02J7/10, H02J13/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINER SPEICHERZELLE, SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINER SPEICHERZELLE UND SPEICHERZELLENSYSTEM[2015/05]
English:METHOD FOR MONITORING STORAGE CELL, SYSTEM FOR MONITORING STORAGE CELL, AND STORAGE CELL SYSTEM[2015/05]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE DE CELLULE DE STOCKAGE, SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE DE CELLULE DE STOCKAGE ET SYSTÈME DE CELLULE DE STOCKAGE[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase14.11.2013Translation filed 
14.11.2013National basic fee paid 
14.11.2013Search fee paid 
30.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.05.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
14.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.05.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2011160258  (PANASONIC CORP [JP]; XU MING [CN]; ZHANG XIAOFEI [CN]; NAKAMURA YASUHI) [I] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 US2013085696  [ ] (XU MING [CN] ET AL) [ ] * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 36 - page 11, paragraph 143; figures 1-10 *;
 [I]US2012038312  (ABE KEIKO [JP] ET AL) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 60 - paragraph 61; figures 7-9 * * page 6, paragraph 82 - page 7, paragraph 91; figures 14,15 *;
 [I]EP2386754  (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY [JP]) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * page 6, paragraph 22 - page 7, paragraph 37; figures 1-6 *;
 [YP]US2012223670  (KINJO TATSUTO [JP] ET AL) [YP] 1-13 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 14 - page 2, paragraph 15 * * page 2, paragraph 40 - page 4, paragraph 53 * * page 4, paragraph 55 - page 7, paragraph 99; figures 1-6 *;
 [Y]US2011196633  (ABE KEIKO [JP] ET AL) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 19 * * page 3, paragraph 36 - page 6, paragraph 79; figures 1-7 *
International search[Y]WO2012032776  (PANASONIC CORP.);
 [Y]JP2011075364  (SHIN-KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2011069693