Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2827777

EP2827777 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ACQUIRING AND ANALYZING MULTIPLE IMAGE DATA LOOPS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.11.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
22.11.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ultrasound Medical Devices, Inc.
3917 Research Park Drive, Suite B7
Ann Arbor, MI 48108 / US
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / HAMILTON, James
3917 Research Park Drive
Suite B7
Ann Arbor, MI 48108 / US
02 / SIECZKA, Eric, J.
3917 Research Park Drive
Suite B7
Ann Arbor, MI 48108 / US
03 / LARSON, Eric, T.
3917 Research Park Drive
Suite B7
Ann Arbor, MI 48108 / US
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Zacco Denmark A/S
Arne Jacobsens Allé 15
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
[2015/05]
Application number, filing date13764345.812.03.2013
WO2013US30445
Priority number, dateUS201261614866P23.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261614866 P
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013142144
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2827777
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61B8/08, G01R33/48, A61B8/00
[2015/51]
Former International [2015/05]A61B8/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERFASSUNG UND ANALYSE VON MEHREREN BILDDATENSCHLEIFEN[2015/05]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ACQUIRING AND ANALYZING MULTIPLE IMAGE DATA LOOPS[2015/05]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ACQUISITION ET D'ANALYSE DE MULTIPLES BOUCLES DE DONNÉES D'IMAGE[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase23.10.2014National basic fee paid 
23.10.2014Search fee paid 
23.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
08.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.11.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
06.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
05.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201705   M06   Fee paid on   20.09.2017
31.03.201806   M06   Fee paid on   06.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2009017991  (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6447450  (OLSTAD BJOERN [NO]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2010004479  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1079240  (GE VINGMED ULTRASOUND AS [NO]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [XI]  - Sergio, "Speckle-Tracking Echocardiography", (20110101), URL: http://www.jultrasoundmed.org/content/30/1/71.full.pdf, (20151030), XP055224855 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * [I] 11-16
International search[Y]US2007016031  (MOURAD PIERRE D [US], et al);
 [Y]US5976088  (URBANO JOSEPH A [US], et al);
 [Y]US2004267117  (WRIGHT KENNETH M [US], et al);
 [A]US2009156934  (LEE SUK JIN [KR], et al);
 [A]US6447450  (OLSTAD BJOERN [NO])