Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2829104

EP2829104 - NULL-DATA PACKET THROUGHPUT SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.03.2019  [2019/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / RUSSEL, Michael
69 Northgate Street
Nepean, Ontario K2G 6C7 / CA
02 / SMITH, Roland
595 Anjana Circle
Nepean K2J 0E1 / CA
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Röthinger, Rainer
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Röthinger, Rainer
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date13764372.219.03.2013
WO2013IB01036
Priority number, dateUS201261612962P19.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261612962 P
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013140264
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2829104
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE27.03.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/06, H04L12/24, H04L12/26
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR NULLDATENPAKETDURCHSATZ[2015/05]
English:NULL-DATA PACKET THROUGHPUT SYSTEM AND METHOD[2015/05]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉBIT DE PAQUETS DE DONNÉES VIDES[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase15.05.2014National basic fee paid 
15.05.2014Search fee paid 
15.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.05.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
23.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/10]
30.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201806   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2008025259  (PONNUSWAMY SUBBU [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0055] * [I] 6-9
International search[A]US2008025259  (PONNUSWAMY SUBBU [US], et al);
 [A]US2012026909  (SEOK YONG HO [KR]);
 [A]EP1335545  (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR])
by applicantUS2008025259