Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2830249

EP2830249 - CONTROL SIGNALING TRANSMISSION AND DEMODULATION METHOD, SYSTEM AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Yijian
c/o ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / DAI, Bo
c/o ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / ZUO, Zhisong
c/o ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
04 / LI, Yu Ngok
c/o ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Petraz, Gilberto Luigi , et al
GLP S.r.l.
Viale Europa Unita, 171
33100 Udine / IT
Application number, filing date13764660.018.03.2013
WO2013CN72830
Priority number, dateCN2012107268819.03.2012         Original published format: CN201210072688
CN2012107626121.03.2012         Original published format: CN201210076261
[2015/05]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013139246
Date:26.09.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2830249
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN26.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L5/00
[2015/17]
Former International [2015/05]H04L1/06, H04W72/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
TitleGerman:STEUERSIGNALÜBERTRAGUNGS- UND -DEMODULATIONSVERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND ENDGERÄT[2015/05]
English:CONTROL SIGNALING TRANSMISSION AND DEMODULATION METHOD, SYSTEM AND TERMINAL[2015/05]
French:PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET TERMINAL DE TRANSMISSION ET DE DÉMODULATION DE SIGNALISATION DE COMMANDE[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase18.09.2014Translation filed 
18.09.2014National basic fee paid 
18.09.2014Search fee paid 
18.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
16.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2019Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
10.04.2019Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
25.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]  - ZTE, "Discussion on DMRS based enhanced PDCCH transmission", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-120312, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120202), vol. RAN WG1, no. Dresden, Germany, XP050563305 [X] 1-3,6-11,15 * the whole document * [A] 4,5,12-14
 [X]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "Considerations on RS for E-PDCCH", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-120447, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120131), vol. RAN WG1, no. Dresden, Germany; 20120206 - 20120210, XP050562935 [X] 1-3,6-11,15 * the whole document *
International search[XP]CN102395206  (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH);
 [A]WO2010058245  (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al)
 [X]  - "3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #68 - CONFIGURATION OF LOCALIZED AND DISTRIBUTED TRANSMISSION FOR E-PDCCH", (20120210), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsgran/WG1RL1/TSGR168/Docs/R1-120681.zip, XP050563075
 [Y]  - "3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #68 RL-120186 - DMRS BASED E-PDCCH TRANSMISSION SCHEMES", (20120210), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsgran/WG1RL1/TSGR168/Docs/R1-120186.zip, XP050563167
 [X]  - "3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #67 R1-114302", (20111118), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsgran/WG1RL1/TSGR167/Docs/R1-114302.zip, XP050562352