Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2829910

EP2829910 - REFLECTIVE COLOR DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toppan Printing Co., Ltd.
5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku
Tokyo 110-0016 / JP
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / KITAZAWA, Kazushige
c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO. LTD.
5-1 Taito 1-chome
Taito-ku
Tokyo 110-0016 / JP
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2015/05]
Application number, filing date13764967.919.03.2013
WO2013JP57887
Priority number, dateJP2012006401421.03.2012         Original published format: JP 2012064014
[2015/05]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013141256
Date:26.09.2013
Language:JA
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2829910
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/167, G02B5/20
[2015/48]
Former International [2015/05]G02F1/167
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
TitleGerman:REFLEKTIERENDE FARBANZEIGE[2015/05]
English:REFLECTIVE COLOR DISPLAY[2015/05]
French:AFFICHAGE DE COULEUR RÉFLÉCHISSANTE[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase19.09.2014Translation filed 
19.09.2014National basic fee paid 
19.09.2014Search fee paid 
19.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
11.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/46]
04.06.2019Date of oral proceedings
25.06.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/46]
25.06.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.04.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US7343112  (ITO NOBUYUKI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-6 * page 4, line 41 - line 56; figures 1,2 *;
 [E]US2013088769  (FUJISHIRO KOICHI [JP] ET AL) [E] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0033] , [0048]; figures 2,3 *
International search[X]WO2011155410  (NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2010139863  (BRIDGESTONE CORP.);
 [A]JP2009103886  (BRIDGESTONE CORP.)
by applicantJP2003161964