Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2829632

EP2829632 - GOLDEN RIGID DECORATIVE MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Database last updated on 17.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Change - classificationpublished on 24.07.2019 [2019/30]
21.06.2019Change - classificationpublished on 24.07.2019 [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Citizen Watch Co., Ltd.
1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi
Tokyo 188-8511 / JP
[2017/47]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Citizen Holdings Co., Ltd.
1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome
Nishitokyo-shi, Tokyo 188-8511 / JP
For all designated states
Citizen Watch Co., Ltd.
1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi
Tokyo 188-8511 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAKAZAKI, Koutarou
c/o CITIZEN WATCH CO. LTD.
1-12 Tanashicho 6-chome
Nishitokyo-shi Tokyo 188-8511 / JP
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB
Kronenstraße 30
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner
Kronenstrasse 30
70174 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date13765078.428.02.2013
WO2013JP55486
Priority number, dateJP2012006221819.03.2012         Original published format: JP 2012062218
[2015/05]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013140988
Date:26.09.2013
Language:JA
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2829632
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:C23C14/06, A44C5/00, G04B37/22, C23C14/34, C23C14/00, C23C14/02, A44C27/00
[2019/30]
Former International [2015/05]C23C14/06, A44C5/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
TitleGerman:GOLDENES STARRES ZIERELEMENT[2015/05]
English:GOLDEN RIGID DECORATIVE MEMBER[2015/05]
French:ÉLÉMENT DÉCORATIF RIGIDE DORÉ[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase16.06.2014Translation filed 
16.09.2014National basic fee paid 
16.09.2014Search fee paid 
16.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
22.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.02.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
21.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XYI]EP0558061  (HAUZER HOLDING [NL]) [X] 1,2,4,9 * claim 13 * * page 8, line 32 - line 33 * * page 11, line 56 * * page 12, line 19 * [Y] 8 [I] 3,5-7,10;
 [X]US2005109607  (EHIASARIAN ARUTIUN P [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * claim 15 *;
 [XY]DE102004044919  (BALZER MARTIN [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9 * claim 13 * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0019] * [Y] 8;
 [Y]US2008014420  (CHAN SHUI WOO [HK]) [Y] 8 * paragraphs [0037] , [0 38] *
International search[Y]WO2011016488  (TUNGALOY CORP [JP], et al);
 [Y]JPH11302831  (KOBE STEEL LTD, et al);
 [Y]WO2010150411  (OSG CORP [JP], et al);
 [Y]JPS5485214  (SUWA SEIKOSHA KK);
 [Y]JP2011256424  (CITIZEN HOLDINGS CO LTD, et al)
by applicantJP2003082452
 JPH02138460